This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/04/2020 at 08:01:49 (UTC).

BARBARA MARIE DAMRON Vs. TERRY L DAMRON

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 BARBARA MARIE DAMRON filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against TERRY L DAMRON. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LOAR, DONEENE. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5-FD

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LOAR, DONEENE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DAMRON, BARBARA MARIE

Pinellas Park, FL 33782

Respondent

DAMRON, TERRY L

Lowell, FL 32663

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketNOTICE; Doc # 14; TO FILE DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketNOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OR FINAL HEARING; Doc # 15; 2/20/2020 1:30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED; Doc # 13; Party: DAMRON, TERRY L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialPETITIONER; DAMRON, BARBARA MARIE; Total Financial Assessment; 14.49; Total Payments and Credits; 14.49; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # SB-2020-01303; DAMRON, BARBARA MARIE; (0.69)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialPETITIONER; DAMRON, BARBARA MARIE; Total Financial Assessment; 14.49; Total Payments and Credits; 14.49; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 0.69

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT; Doc # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS; Doc # 11; 122719; Party: DAMRON, TERRY L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPETITIONER; DAMRON, BARBARA MARIE; Total Financial Assessment; 14.49; Total Payments and Credits; 14.49; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # SB-2019-20222; DAMRON, BARBARA MARIE; (13.80)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPETITIONER; DAMRON, BARBARA MARIE; Total Financial Assessment; 14.49; Total Payments and Credits; 14.49; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 3.30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPETITIONER; DAMRON, BARBARA MARIE; Total Financial Assessment; 14.49; Total Payments and Credits; 14.49; Balance Due 0.00; INDIGENT; 407.50

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF; Doc # 1; FOR SERVICE IN MARION COUNTY; Party: DAMRON, TERRY L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION WITHOUT MINOR CHILDREN; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION REGARDING PARTIES; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPETITIONER'S FINANCIAL STATEMENT-AFFIDAVIT; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSEALED SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER PLAINTIFF - PETITIONER; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE; Doc # 9; Party: DAMRON, BARBARA MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS APPROVED; Doc # 10; Party: DAMRON, BARBARA MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less