This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 12/26/2020 at 17:25:53 (UTC).

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON Vs. BPTR LLC , et al

Case Summary

On 07/29/2015 BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BPTR LLC ,. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2-CI

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FORMERLY KNOWN AS BANK OF NEW YORK AS TRUSTEE FOR CERTIFICATEHOLDERS OF THE CWABS INC ETC

Defendants

BPTR LLC

CITY OF DUNEDIN

COCO, JUNE E

DOE, TONY FORMERLY KNOWN AS UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT SERVICE OF PROCESS

08/19/2015: AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO-COUNSEL

06/13/2016: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO-COUNSEL

NOTICE OF SALE

09/20/2018: NOTICE OF SALE

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE

08/19/2015: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE

NOTICE OF FILING

06/27/2018: NOTICE OF FILING

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

06/13/2016: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

AFFIDAVIT SERVICE OF PROCESS

08/19/2015: AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS

CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

05/16/2018: CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

ATTACHMENT

08/19/2015: ATTACHMENT

101 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketCOPY CERT OF TITLE & CERT OF NO DISBURSEMENT RETD BY PO; Doc # 30; Party: DOE, TONY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketCOPY CERT OF TITLE & CERT OF NO DISBURSEMENT RETD BY PO; Doc # 31; Party: COCO, JUNE E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE; Doc # 28; Vol./Book 20336, Page 2383, 1 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT; Doc # 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON; Total Financial Assessment; 3,500.20; Total Payments and Credits; 3,500.20; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2018-30790; PERFECT ATTENDANCE; (1,379.70)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON; Total Financial Assessment; 3,500.20; Total Payments and Credits; 3,500.20; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 1,379.70

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • DocketCOPY CERTIFICATE OF SALE RETURNED BY POST OFFICE; Doc # 26; Party: DOE, TONY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • DocketCOPY CERTIFICATE OF SALE RETURNED BY POST OFFICE; Doc # 27; Party: COCO, JUNE E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketJUDICIAL ONLINE SALE; (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL); REC VER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SALE; Doc # 25; THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
107 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2015
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROP-MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE; FORM C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • DocketPLAINTIFF-LENDER CONTACT INFORMATION SHEET; FORM D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; ISSUED ON 8/3/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; ISSUED ON 8/3/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; ISSUED ON 8/3/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; ISSUED ON 8/3/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; ISSUED ON 8/3/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; ISSUED ON 8/3/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; ISSUED ON 8/3/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant