Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 05/23/2021 at 20:06:26 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA Vs. LINDA K MILLS

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LINDA K MILLS. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARASSAS, JOHN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4-SC

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARASSAS, JOHN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA NA

7765 Sw 87Th Ave

Miami, FL 33173

Defendant

MILLS, LINDA K

Saint Petersburg, FL 33705-6046

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANA M STERN, ESQ

Attorney at HAYT HAYT & LANDAU P L

7765 Sw 87Th Ave Ste 101

Miami, FL 33173

 

Court Documents

NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED

03/08/2021: NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom326734838

02/25/2021: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

EXHIBIT

02/22/2021: EXHIBIT

SUMMONS NOT ISSUED

02/22/2021: SUMMONS NOT ISSUED

COMPLAINT E-FILED

02/22/2021: COMPLAINT E-FILED

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

02/22/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD; (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN); Result: SC HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketDEFAULT-JUDGMENT UPON RECEIPT OF; Doc # 6; AFFDS IN PROOF OF COST, STATEMENT OF PRINCIPAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED; Doc # 5; Party: MILLS, LINDA K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BANK OF AMERICA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-07091; BANK OF AMERICA NA; (310.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BANK OF AMERICA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT E-FILED; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS NOT ISSUED; Doc # 3; NOT USED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 4; AFFIDAVIT & ACCOUNT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STERN , DANA M