This case was last updated from Pinellas County Courts on 04/05/2022 at 20:06:25 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA Vs. LORETTA PURPURA

Case Summary

On 01/05/2022 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LORETTA PURPURA. This case was filed in Pinellas County Courts, St. Petersburg Branch Office - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KELLY, LORRAINE. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7-SC

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KELLY, LORRAINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BANK OF AMERICA N A

887 Donald Ross Road

Juno Beach, FL 33408

BANK OF AMERICA NA

887 Donald Ross Road

Juno Beach, FL 33408

Defendant

PURPURA, LORETTA

St Petersburg, FL 33710-5442

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JORGE L PALMA, ESQ

Attorney at ANDREU PALMA LAVIN & SOLIS

815 Nw 57Th Avenue Suite 401

Miami, FL 33126

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

01/05/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/05/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS - NOT ISSUED

01/05/2022: SUMMONS - NOT ISSUED

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

01/05/2022: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

EXHIBIT

01/05/2022: EXHIBIT

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

01/05/2022: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom331772805

01/07/2022: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

DEFAULT JUDGMENT

04/01/2022: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

SUMMONS - SERVED

02/16/2022: SUMMONS - SERVED

AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

03/29/2022: AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

03/29/2022: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF FILING

03/29/2022: NOTICE OF FILING

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

03/29/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDEFAULT JUDGMENT; Doc # 13; (FINAL); Vol./Book 22006, Page 349, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS - CASE DISPOSED BY DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS; Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Doc # 10; (DEFAULT); Party: BANK OF AMERICA NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Doc # 11; AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS; Doc # 12; (EXHIBIT A) W/ ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD; (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer KELLY, LORRAINE); Result: SC HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketDEFAULT-JUDGMENT UPON RECEIPT OF; Doc # 8; AFFDS IN PROOF OF CLAIM, COST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 7; 02152022; Party: PURPURA, LORETTA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BANK OF AMERICA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2022-00410; BANK OF AMERICA N A; (310.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BANK OF AMERICA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - NOT ISSUED; Doc # 3; NOT USED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 5; A - ACCOUNT SUMMARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Palma, Jorge L, ESQ.