Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/08/2021 at 12:36:48 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA N A Vs. AMANDA JADE JOHNSON

Case Summary

On 06/17/2019 BANK OF AMERICA N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AMANDA JADE JOHNSON. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARASSAS, JOHN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7-CO

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARASSAS, JOHN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA N A

815 Nw 57Th Avenue Ste.401

Miami, FL 33126

Defendant

JOHNSON, AMANDA JADE

Saint Petersburg, FL 33710

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YULEXY SOLIS GARCIA, ESQ

Attorney at ANDREU PALMA et al PLLC

815 Nw 57 Ave Ste 401

Miami, FL 33126

 

Court Documents

CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED

03/30/2020: CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED

Case Transfer Receipt

03/24/2020: RECEIPT

CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT-TRACKING SLIP

03/24/2020: CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT-TRACKING SLIP

Case Transfer Out of County

02/27/2020: CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE TRANSFER FEES DUE

ORDER GRANTING

02/25/2020: ORDER GRANTING

PLTF-PET'S MOTION

02/19/2020: PLTF-PET'S MOTION

SUMMONS - RETURNED NOT SERVED

10/17/2019: SUMMONS - NOT SERVED

RECEIPT

03/31/2020: RECEIPT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/17/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

06/17/2019: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

EXHIBIT

06/17/2019: EXHIBIT

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

06/17/2019: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

06/17/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

COMPLAINT

06/17/2019: COMPLAINT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketRECEIPT; Doc # 17; TRANSFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED; Doc # 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BANK OF AMERICA N A; Total Financial Assessment; 324.15; Total Payments and Credits; 324.15; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2020-08240; ANDREU, PALMA LAVIN & SOLIS, PLLC; (14.15)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BANK OF AMERICA N A; Total Financial Assessment; 324.15; Total Payments and Credits; 324.15; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 14.15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT-TRACKING SLIP; Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketRECEIPT; Doc # 12; FOR TRANSFERRED PLEADINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • Docket(((((FILE VERIFIED TO THIS DATE))))); Doc # 13; MS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketDO NOT DOCKET - CASE CONSOLIDATED OR TRANSFERRED; Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketCASE TRANSFERRED (SRS DISPOSITION); Doc # 15; PASCO COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE TRANSFER FEES DUE; Doc # 10; FEE DUE LETTER EMAILED TO PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION; Doc # 8; TO TRANSFER VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS - NOT SERVED; Doc # 7; Party: JOHNSON, AMANDA JADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BANK OF AMERICA N A; Total Financial Assessment; 324.15; Total Payments and Credits; 324.15; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-22742; BANK OF AMERICA N A; (310.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BANK OF AMERICA N A; Total Financial Assessment; 324.15; Total Payments and Credits; 324.15; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 4; ACCOUNT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 6; ISSUED; Party: JOHNSON, AMANDA JADE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Garcia, Yulexy Solis, ESQ.