This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 03/22/2019 at 08:04:08 (UTC).

B GRIFFITH ROOFING INC Vs. VITOLD STAWIEREJ, et al

Case Summary

On 01/21/2019 B GRIFFITH ROOFING INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against VITOLD STAWIEREJ. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARASSAS, JOHN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0-CO

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARASSAS, JOHN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

B GRIFFITH ROOFING INC

5292 Main Street

St. Petersburg, FL 33714

B GRIFFITH ROOFING INC A/AN FLORIDA CORPORATION

5292 Main Street

St. Petersburg, FL 33714

Defendants

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF VITOLD STAWIEREJ

Chicago, IL 60656

STAWIEREJ, VITOLD

Chicago, IL 60656

ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES ETC

ANY KNOWN AND UNKNOWN TENANTS OWNERS

Clearwater, FL 33756

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PATRICK O'CONNOR

Attorney at O'CONNOR LAW FIRM

2240 Belleair Road Suite 115

Clearwater, FL 33764

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE

01/28/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE

01/28/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS

01/28/2019: AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

01/23/2019: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/21/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/21/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/21/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NON RECORDED LIS PENDENS

01/21/2019: NON RECORDED LIS PENDENS

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

01/21/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

COMPLAINT

01/21/2019: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2019
  • CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION); Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Doc # 12; WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS; Party: B GRIFFITH ROOFING INC; Vol./Book 20431, Page 2072, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS; Doc # 8; 012619; Party: STAWIEREJ, VITOLD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE; Doc # 9; Party: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF VITOLD STAWIEREJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE; Doc # 10; Party: ANY KNOWN AND UNKNOWN TENANTS OWNERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Doc # 7; Vol./Book 20415, Page 197, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • COMPLAINT; Doc # 1; WITH ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • NON RECORDED LIS PENDENS; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 4; ISSUED; Party: STAWIEREJ, VITOLD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 5; ISSUED; Party: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF VITOLD STAWIEREJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 6; ISSUED; Party: ANY KNOWN AND UNKNOWN TENANTS OWNERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • PLAINTIFF; B GRIFFITH ROOFING INC; Total Financial Assessment; 397.00; Total Payments and Credits; 397.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2019-04131; B GRIFFITH ROOFING INC; (9.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • PLAINTIFF; B GRIFFITH ROOFING INC; Total Financial Assessment; 397.00; Total Payments and Credits; 397.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 9.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • PLAINTIFF; B GRIFFITH ROOFING INC; Total Financial Assessment; 397.00; Total Payments and Credits; 397.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2019-02400; B GRIFFITH ROOFING INC; (9.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • PLAINTIFF; B GRIFFITH ROOFING INC; Total Financial Assessment; 397.00; Total Payments and Credits; 397.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 9.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • PLAINTIFF; B GRIFFITH ROOFING INC; Total Financial Assessment; 397.00; Total Payments and Credits; 397.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-02664; B GRIFFITH ROOFING INC; (379.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • PLAINTIFF; B GRIFFITH ROOFING INC; Total Financial Assessment; 397.00; Total Payments and Credits; 397.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 379.00

    Read MoreRead Less