Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/08/2021 at 12:40:04 (UTC).

B AND L CREMATION SERVICES INC Vs. 8132 GARNERS FERRY ROAD LLC

Case Summary

On 06/17/2019 B AND L CREMATION SERVICES INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against 8132 GARNERS FERRY ROAD LLC. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAGGER, EDWIN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0-CO

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAGGER, EDWIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

B AND L CREMATION SERVICES INC A FLORIDA CORPORATION

7205 114Th Avenue

Largo, FL 33773

Defendants

8132 GARNERS FERRY ROAD LLC DOING BUSINESS AS JP HOLLEY FUNDERAL HOME

8132 Garners Ferry Rd

Columbia, SC 29209

8132 GARNERS FERRY ROAD LLC DOING BUSINESS AS JP HOLLEY FUNERAL HOME

8132 Garners Ferry Rd

Columbia, SC 29209

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TERRENCE SCOTT BUCHERT

47121

St Petersburg, FL 33743

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT

10/15/2019: FINAL JUDGMENT

ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

10/15/2019: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT

10/08/2019: AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF FILING

10/08/2019: NOTICE OF FILING

PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN

11/22/2019: PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN

ATTACHMENT

07/08/2019: ATTACHMENT

AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS

07/08/2019: AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS

PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT

07/25/2019: DEFAULT ENTERED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/21/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/17/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

EXHIBIT

06/17/2019: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

06/17/2019: EXHIBIT

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

06/17/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

COMPLAINT

06/17/2019: COMPLAINT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; B AND L CREMATION SERVICES INC; Total Financial Assessment; 323.00; Total Payments and Credits; 323.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2019-30445; B AND L CREMATION SERVICES INC; (13.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; B AND L CREMATION SERVICES INC; Total Financial Assessment; 323.00; Total Payments and Credits; 323.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 13.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketJUDGMENT LIEN (R); Doc # 16; Vol./Book 20791, Page 2001, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketPRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN; Doc # 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY COVER LETTER; Doc # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketDEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO); Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT; Doc # 15; IN FAVOR OF PLTF; Vol./Book 20737, Page 2251, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Doc # 11; AFFIDAVIT OF DAMAGES AND DEFAULT OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT- NOT ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT; Doc # 12; AFFIDAVIT OF DAMAGES AND DEFAULT OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED; Doc # 10; Party: 8132 GARNERS FERRY ROAD LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; B AND L CREMATION SERVICES INC; Total Financial Assessment; 323.00; Total Payments and Credits; 323.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2019-16182; B AND L CREMATION SERVICES INC; (10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; B AND L CREMATION SERVICES INC; Total Financial Assessment; 323.00; Total Payments and Credits; 323.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 6; ISSUED; Party: 8132 GARNERS FERRY ROAD LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; B AND L CREMATION SERVICES INC; Total Financial Assessment; 323.00; Total Payments and Credits; 323.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-22792; B AND L CREMATION SERVICES INC; (300.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; B AND L CREMATION SERVICES INC; Total Financial Assessment; 323.00; Total Payments and Credits; 323.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 3; TUNE UP SERVICE CONFIRMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 4; STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 5; NOT ISSUED /NO SUMMONS FEE PAID; Party: 8132 GARNERS FERRY ROAD LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUCHERT , TERRENCE SCOTT