This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 03/08/2019 at 08:01:47 (UTC).

AVI YOGEV Vs. ALEXIS LARAY REED

Case Summary

On 01/07/2019 AVI YOGEV filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ALEXIS LARAY REED. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARASSAS, JOHN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8-CO

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARASSAS, JOHN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YOGEV, AVI

Clearwater, FL 33758

Defendant

REED, ALEXIS LARAY

Clearwater, FL 33756

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

01/23/2019: FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

WRIT OF POSSESSION

02/06/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION

Sheriffs Log Form

Sheriffs Log Form

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO SHERIFF

01/24/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO SHERIFF

DEFAULT ENTERED BY COURT

01/23/2019: DEFAULT ENTERED BY COURT

FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

01/23/2019: FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT

01/15/2019: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT

RESPONSE

01/15/2019: RESPONSE

ANSWER OF

01/14/2019: ANSWER OF

Sheriffs Log Form

Sheriffs Log Form

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF

01/25/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO SHERIFF

SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

01/10/2019: SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF

01/07/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

01/07/2019: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/07/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

THREE DAY NOTICE

01/07/2019: THREE DAY NOTICE

COMPLAINT - II COUNTS

01/07/2019: COMPLAINT - II COUNTS

CERT OF MAILING - TENANT EVICTION

01/08/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2019
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 20; RETD EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO SHERIFF; Doc # 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED; Doc # 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO SHERIFF; Doc # 18; RETURNED BY SHERIFF / INCORRECT ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; Doc # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • JUDGMENT (SRS); Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION; Doc # 15; IN FAVOR OF PLTF; Vol./Book 20412, Page 2525, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DEFAULT ENTERED BY COURT; Doc # 16; Party: REED, ALEXIS LARAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • UNSIGNED ORDER SENT TO JUDGE; Doc # 12; MOTION AND PROPOSED ORDER FOR COURT DEFAULT AND FINAL JUDGMENT W/ ENVS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • RESPONSE; Doc # 9; TO ANSWER WITH ATTACHED LETTER TO TENANT, NOTICE ON DOOR, BILL, TEXTS BETWEEN PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2019
  • SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED; Doc # 7; 010719; Party: REED, ALEXIS LARAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Doc # 6; Party: REED, ALEXIS LARAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • COMPLAINT - II COUNTS; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • THREE DAY NOTICE; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF; Doc # 5; Party: REED, ALEXIS LARAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • PLAINTIFF; YOGEV, AVI; Total Financial Assessment; 198.50; Total Payments and Credits; 198.50; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2019-00571; YOGEV, AVI; (198.50)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • PLAINTIFF; YOGEV, AVI; Total Financial Assessment; 198.50; Total Payments and Credits; 198.50; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 3.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • PLAINTIFF; YOGEV, AVI; Total Financial Assessment; 198.50; Total Payments and Credits; 198.50; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 195.00

    Read MoreRead Less