This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/19/2020 at 14:56:40 (UTC).

AUSTIN BARTO Vs. BEACON ON 3RD STREET CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, et al

Case Summary

On 06/09/2020 AUSTIN BARTO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BEACON ON 3RD STREET CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are COVERT, THANE and MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7-CI

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

COVERT, THANE

MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARTO, AUSTIN

Valrico, FL 33596

Defendants

COMPLETE ALUMINUM GENERAL CONTRACTORS INC DOING BUSINESS AS COMPLETE GENERAL CONTRACTING GROUP

1910 Barber Road

Sarasota, FL 34240

BEACON ON 3RD STREET CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION

111 2Nd Avenue, North, Suite 539

St. Petersburg, FL 33701

TORTORA, CHRISTOPHER

Sarasota, FL 34232

Not Classified By Court

LANG ENVIRONMENTAL INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIM E WELLS

Attorney at WELLS LAW GROUP PA

1211 Tech Boulevard Suite 149

Tampa, FL 33619

Defendant Attorneys

HANNAH M TYSON, ESQ

Attorney at MOYER LAW GROUP

801 Third St S

St Petersburg, FL 33701

KELLIE A CAGGIANO, ESQ

Attorney at MOYER LAW GROUP

801 Third St S

St Petersburg, FL 33701

HOWARD L SCHOLL, ESQ

Attorney at COLE SCOTT & KISSANE P A

4301 W Boy Scout Blvd #400

Tampa, FL 33607

SCOTT W PLANKEY, ESQ

Attorney at HIGHTOWER STRATTON NOVIGROD

4427 W Kennedy Blvd #225

Tampa, FL 33609

DALE R HIGHTOWER, ESQ

Attorney at HIGHTOWER STRATTON NOVIGROD

4427 W Kennedy Blvd #225

Tampa, FL 33609

Not Classified By Court Attorney

JONATHAN G KEPKO, ESQ

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD

401 E Jackson St Ste 3400

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

12/01/2020: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

11/30/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/19/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

11/04/2020: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

11/02/2020: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/16/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/16/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/13/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

09/09/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS

09/09/2020: DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF

07/30/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

07/30/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR THIRD PARTY SUMMONS

07/24/2020: REQUEST FOR THIRD PARTY SUMMONS

THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT

07/16/2020: THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF FILING

07/14/2020: NOTICE OF FILING

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/29/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

06/09/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/09/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

80 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION; Doc # 92

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 93

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 94; SECOND SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Doc # 91

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY; Doc # 89; 12102020 W/ATTACHED SUBPOENAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Doc # 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 87

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 88; TO THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Doc # 85

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY; Doc # 86; 12012020 W/ATTACHED SUBPOENA

    Read MoreRead Less
81 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 11; 6/16/2020; Party: COMPLETE ALUMINUM GENERAL CONTRACTORS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BARTO, AUSTIN; Total Financial Assessment; 430.00; Total Payments and Credits; 430.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2020-19499; BARTO, AUSTIN; (430.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BARTO, AUSTIN; Total Financial Assessment; 430.00; Total Payments and Credits; 430.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 430.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2; WITH ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 3; ISSUED; Party: COMPLETE ALUMINUM GENERAL CONTRACTORS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 4; ISSUED; Party: BEACON ON 3RD STREET CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 5; ISSUED; Party: TORTORA, CHRISTOPHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Complete Aluminum General Contractors Inc., is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KEPKO , JONATHAN G