Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 01/14/2021 at 06:41:05 (UTC).

ATALANTI KAROFTIS Vs. WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP INC, et al

Case Summary

On 09/06/2017 ATALANTI KAROFTIS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP INC. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MEYER, KEITH. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4-CI

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MEYER, KEITH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KAROFTIS, ATALANTI

Tarpon Springs, FL 34689

Defendants

SEARS ROEBUCK AND CO A/AN FOREIGN PROFIT CORPORATION

3333 Beverly Rd

Hoffman Estates, IL 60179

WHOLE FOODS MARKET IP LP A/AN FOREIGN LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

550 Bowie Street

Austin, TX 78703

WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP INC A FOREIGN PROFIT CORPORATION

WESTFIELD LLC A/AN FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

2049 Century Park East 41St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

WEA COUNTRYSIDE GP LLC A/AN FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

2049 Century Park East 41St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

SERITAGE GROWTH PROPERTIES LP A/AN FOREIGN LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

489 Fifth Ave 18Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

WFM IP MANAGEMENT INC A/AN FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

550 Bowie Street

Austin, TX 78703

BELLWETHER PROPERTIES OF FLORIDA LIMITED A/AN FLORIDA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

2049 Century Park East 41St Floor C/O Westfield Llc

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

EDUARDO LATOUR

Attorney at LATOUR & ASSOCIATES PA

135 East Lemon Street

Tarpon Springs, FL 34689

EDUARDO R LATOUR, ESQ

Attorney at LATOUR & ASSOCIATES PA

135 East Lemon St

Tarpon Springs, FL 34689

Defendant Attorneys

MICHAEL L FORTE

Attorney at RUMBERGER KIRK CALDWELL

3390

Tampa, FL 33601

SARA S WHITEHEAD

Attorney at RUMBERGER KIRK CALDWELL PA

100 N Tampa St Ste 2000

Tampa, FL 33601

H JACEY KAPS

Attorney at RUMBERGER KIRK & CALDWELL P A

80 Sw 8 St Ste 3000

Miami, FL 33130

MICHAEL L FORTE, ESQ

Attorney at RUMBERGER KIRK & CALDWELL P A

100 N Tampa St Ste 2000 P O Box 3390

Tampa, FL 33601-3390

DEREK H LLOYD

Attorney at THE CHARTWELL LAW OFFICES LLP

100 Se 2Nd St Ste 2150

Miami, FL 33131

DEREK H LLOYD, ESQ

Attorney at CHARTWELL LAW

1191 E Newport Ctr Dr

Deerfield Beach, FL 33442

ROBERT W BLEAKLEY, ESQ

Attorney at BLEAKLEY BAVOL DENMAN

15170 N Florida Ave

Tampa, FL 33613

R G MACK MCCORMICK JR, ESQ

Attorney at JOSEPHER & BATTEESE P A

15170 N Florida Ave

Tampa, FL 33613

 

Court Documents

SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AS TO

10/15/2018: SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AS TO

REQUEST FOR COPIES

05/11/2018: REQUEST FOR COPIES

ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

04/05/2018: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

03/30/2018: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

03/22/2018: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

DEFT RESP'S MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

03/09/2018: DEFT-RESP'S MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/04/2018: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

10/04/2017: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

COMPLAINT

09/06/2017: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

11/12/2020: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

03/25/2020: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

03/19/2020: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

COPY

02/07/2020: COPY

CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

02/07/2020: CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

DEF-RESP'S EMERGENCY MOTION

02/04/2020: DEF-RESP'S EMERGENCY MOTION

MOTION

02/04/2020: MOTION

CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

06/05/2019: CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

STIPULATION

05/24/2019: STIPULATION

121 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Doc # 137; 01/15/2021 9:30 AM (TELEPHONIC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; Doc # 136

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; Doc # 134; PROPOSED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketORDER GRANTING; Doc # 135; DEFT EMERGENCY MOTN FOR STAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING; Doc # 133; SECOND TELEPHONIC 03/30/2020 4:00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketATTORNEY COVER LETTER; Doc # 132; RECEIVED BY COURT 03182020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING; Doc # 129; 03/30/2020 4:00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketCOPY; Doc # 130; EMERGENCY MTN FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND - DOES NOT QUALIFY AS AN EMERGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; Doc # 131; EMERGENCY MTN - RECEIVED BY COURT 02192020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Doc # 128; ATTACHED LEASE AGREEMENT AS EXHIBIT "A"

    Read MoreRead Less
119 More Docket Entries
  • 09/06/2017
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; KAROFTIS, ATALANTI; Total Financial Assessment; 475.00; Total Payments and Credits; 475.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 475.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 3; ISSUED; Party: BELLWETHER PROPERTIES OF FLORIDA LIMITED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 4; ISSUED; Party: SEARS ROEBUCK AND CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 5; ISSUED; Party: SERITAGE GROWTH PROPERTIES LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 6; ISSUED; Party: WEA COUNTRYSIDE GP LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 7; ISSUED; Party: WESTFIELD LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 8; ISSUED; Party: WFM IP MANAGEMENT INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 9; ISSUED; Party: WHOLE FOODS MARKET IP LP

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Whole Foods Market, IP, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP, INC. is a litigant