Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 01/13/2021 at 01:06:26 (UTC).

ANGEL LOVE, et al Vs. BAYSIDE EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS P A, et al

Case Summary

On 07/12/2017 ANGEL LOVE filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against BAYSIDE EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS P A. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAMS, AMY M. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8-CI

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAMS, AMY M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SABBAGH, RICHARD

St Petersburg, FL 33716

LOVE, ANGEL

St Petersburg, FL 33716

Defendants

WENDELL , CATHERINE, MD

St. Petersburg, FL 33705

BELLINGAR DO, BRIDGET

Seminole, FL 33777

ST ANTHONYS HOSPITAL INC

1200 7Th Avenue N.

St. Petersburg, FL 33705

BAYSIDE EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS PA

500 Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr. Street Suite 303

St. Petersburg, FL 33705

BRIDGET BELLINGAR DO PA

Seminole, FL 33777

LAVIERI PA-C, JENNIFER

St. Peterburg, FL 33705

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCOTT M WHITLEY

Defendant Attorneys

IVA M VALTCHEVA

Attorney at LA CAVA AND JACOBSON PA

501 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1250

Tampa, FL 33602

JEFFREY M GOODIS

Attorney at GOODIS THOMPSON & MILLER P A

Post Office Box 90

St Petersburg, FL 33731

JEFFREY M GOODIS, ESQ

KELLY JO LAMB

Attorney at LAMB GOLDMAN CULLARO

3903 Northdale Blvd Ste 290E

Tampa, FL 33624

CARL A GOLDMAN, ESQ

Attorney at BUSH GRAZIANO RICE

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 1400

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

05/04/2018: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

04/25/2018: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

03/26/2018: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

01/10/2018: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR COPIES

01/04/2018: REQUEST FOR COPIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

09/15/2017: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR COPIES

09/14/2017: REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/06/2017: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF

08/18/2017: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF

FINAL JUDGMENT

12/12/2018: FINAL JUDGMENT

FINAL JUDGMENT

11/30/2018: FINAL JUDGMENT

CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

11/30/2018: CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

ORDER GRANTING

11/28/2018: ORDER GRANTING

CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

11/28/2018: CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

11/27/2018: CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

ORDER GRANTING

11/27/2018: ORDER GRANTING

ORDER GRANTING

11/26/2018: ORDER GRANTING

ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

12/13/2018: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

170 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketATTORNEY COVER LETTER; Doc # 162; --- COURT RECEIVED 121018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT; Doc # 160; AS TO BRIDGET BELLINGAR D O AND BRIDGET BELLINGAR D O P A; Vol./Book 20371, Page 2080, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketJUDGMENT (SRS); Doc # 161

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; Doc # 158; PROPOSED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT; Doc # 159; FOR DEFENDANTS BAYSIDE EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS PA/CATHERINE WENDELL MD/JENNIFER LAVIERI PA-C; Vol./Book 20354, Page 1403, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; Doc # 155; PROPOSED ORDERS - RECEIVED BY COURT 112618

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT; Doc # 156; IN FAVOR OF; Party: ST ANTHONYS HOSPITAL INC; Vol./Book 20353, Page 415, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketORDER GRANTING; Doc # 157; DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketORDER GRANTING; Doc # 153; DEFTS BRIDGET BELLINGAR DO/BRIDGET BELLINGAR DO PA MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; Doc # 154; PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED BY COURT 112618

    Read MoreRead Less
168 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketORDER GRANTING; PETITION TO APPROVE ATTORNEYS FEE CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketPETITION FOR; APPROVE ATTORNEYS FEE CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; PROPOSED ORDER - RECEIVED BY COURT 071917

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; LOVE, ANGEL; Total Financial Assessment; 422.50; Total Payments and Credits; 422.50; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2017-23849; LOVE, ANGEL; (422.50)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; LOVE, ANGEL; Total Financial Assessment; 422.50; Total Payments and Credits; 422.50; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 422.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; ISSUED; Party: ST ANTHONYS HOSPITAL INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; ISSUED; Party: BAYSIDE EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS PA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where St. Anthony's Hospital, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCOTT M WHITLEY