Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/08/2021 at 15:34:43 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK Vs. VERONIQUE RAUSSIN

Case Summary

On 06/21/2019 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VERONIQUE RAUSSIN. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAGGER, EDWIN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9-CO

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAGGER, EDWIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

1551 Sawgrass Corporate Parkway Suite 110

Sunrise, FL 33323

Defendant

RAUSSIN, VERONIQUE

Clearwater, FL 33758

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCOTT E MODLIN

Attorney at MODLIN SLINSKY PA

1551 Sawgrass Corp Parkway Suite 110

Sunrise, FL 33323

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF

02/05/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF

CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

01/21/2020: CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

FINAL JUDGMENT

01/21/2020: FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT

01/11/2020: AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

01/11/2020: AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

PLTF-PET'S MOTION

01/11/2020: PLTF-PET'S MOTION

SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AS TO

03/04/2020: SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AS TO

STIPULATION

07/26/2019: STIPULATION

ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

07/30/2019: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/21/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

06/21/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

COMPLAINT

06/21/2019: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketSUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AS TO; Doc # 16; 20-BK-01902; Party: RAUSSIN, VERONIQUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF; Doc # 15; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS. INTERROGATORIES AND PRODUCTION REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketREOPEN - CLOSED; Doc # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT; Doc # 13; (CONSENT); Vol./Book 20862, Page 320, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; Doc # 14; PROPOSED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2020
  • DocketCASE REOPENED; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2020
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION; Doc # 9; FOR CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS; Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Doc # 11; OF NON-PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION); Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY COVER LETTER; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketAGREED ORDER (R); Doc # 7; APPROVING STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT / DISMISSAL W/ O PREJUDICE; Vol./Book 20639, Page 275, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketSTIPULATION; Doc # 4; FOR SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-23457; AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK; (310.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 1; W/ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 3; ISSUED; Party: RAUSSIN, VERONIQUE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Modlin, Scott Eric