This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 10/08/2021 at 07:10:00 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK Vs. SAMPATH KUMAR J, ALSO KNOWN AS SAMPATH KU JAYARAMAN

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SAMPATH KUMAR J, ALSO KNOWN AS SAMPATH KU JAYARAMAN. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6-SC

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

1551 Sawgrass Corporate Parkway Suite 110

Sunrise, FL 33323

Defendant

KUMAR J, SAMPATH ALSO KNOWN AS JAYARAMAN, SAMPATH KU

Tampa, FL 33611

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCOTT E MODLIN

Attorney at MODLIN SLINSKY PA

1551 Sawgrass Corp Pkwy Suite 110

Sunrise, FL 33323

 

Court Documents

COVID ZOOM ALIAS - THURSDAY - SC PRETRIAL - PLTF

10/04/2021: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

COVID ZOOM ALIAS - THURSDAY - SC PRETRIAL - DEFT

10/04/2021: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

TO BE ISSUED - PROCESS

09/30/2021: TO BE ISSUED - PROCESS

RECEIPT

09/17/2021: RECEIPT

CC ORDER TRANSFER CAUSE FROM

09/17/2021: CC ORDER TRANSFER CAUSE FROM

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL; (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officer SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK; Total Financial Assessment; 320.00; Total Payments and Credits; 320.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2021-23578; AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK; (10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK; Total Financial Assessment; 320.00; Total Payments and Credits; 320.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS NOT ISSUED; Doc # 3; FORM NOT USED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK; Total Financial Assessment; 320.00; Total Payments and Credits; 320.00; Balance Due 0.00; PHONE PAYMENT; Receipt # CV-2021-22308; MODLIN, SCOTT E; (10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK; Total Financial Assessment; 320.00; Total Payments and Credits; 320.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK; Total Financial Assessment; 320.00; Total Payments and Credits; 320.00; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2021-22224; AMERICAN RECOVERY SERVICE INC; (300.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK; Total Financial Assessment; 320.00; Total Payments and Credits; 320.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCC ORDER TRANSFER CAUSE FROM; Doc # 1; HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY WITH ATTACHED CASE SUMMARY AND CASE FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketRECEIPT; Doc # 2; FOR TRANSFERRED PLEADINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Modlin, Scott Eric