This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 01/19/2021 at 07:21:40 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB, A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANKC Vs. JACKIE C DOS SANTOS, ALSO KNOWN AS JACKIE DOS SANTOS

Case Summary

On 02/01/2018 AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB, A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANKC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JACKIE C DOS SANTOS, ALSO KNOWN AS JACKIE DOS SANTOS. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARASSAS, JOHN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3-SC

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARASSAS, JOHN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANKC

1551 Sawgrass Corporate Parkway Suite 110

Sunrise, FL 33323

Defendant

DOS SANTOS, JACKIE C ALSO KNOWN AS DOS SANTOS, JACKIE

Palm Harbor, FL 34684

Garnishees

ACHIEVA CREDIT UNION

2201 Drew Street

Clearwater, FL 33765

NEW TEAM LLC

1551 Sawgrass Corporate Parkway Suite 110

Sunrise, FL 33323

BANK OF AMERICA NA

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

JP MORGAN CHASE BANK NA

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

SCRIBEAMERICA LLC

Ra Corporate Creations Network Inc 11380 Prosperity Farms Rd Ste 211E

Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Garnishee and Plaintiff Attorneys

MITCHELL ROSAIRE MORNEAULT

Attorney at MODLIN SLINSKY P A

1551 Sawgrass Corp Pkwy Ste 110

Sunrise, FL 33323

SCOTT E MODLIN

Attorney at MODLIN SLINSKY PA

1551 Sawgrass Corp Pkwy Suite 110

Sunrise, FL 33323

JONATHAN L KUDULIS

Attorney at KUDULIS REISINGER AND PRICE LLC

653

Birmingham, AL 35201

JOSEPH A NOA JR, ESQ

Attorney at NOA LAW FIRM P A

Po Box 941958

Miami, FL 33194

 

Court Documents

W-Transmittal to Judge - Garnishment or Hearing

06/15/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE TO DEF & INTERESTED PARTIES

07/11/2018: NOTICE TO DEF & INTERESTED PARTIES

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

06/07/2018: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

NOTICE

06/05/2018: NOTICE

NOTICE

06/05/2018: NOTICE

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

05/16/2018: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

04/04/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

NOTICE RETURNED SERVED

02/27/2018: NOTICE RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE TO DEF & INTERESTED PARTIES

08/13/2018: NOTICE TO DEF & INTERESTED PARTIES

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

06/06/2018: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

06/04/2018: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

05/16/2018: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

05/16/2018: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

MOTION REQUEST FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

05/16/2018: MOTION-REQUEST FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

NOTICE

04/13/2018: NOTICE

DEFAULT JUDGMENT

04/11/2018: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

04/04/2018: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

02/01/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Doc # 47; OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketCC CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; Doc # 46; RETURNED SERVED 081319 SCRIBEAMERICA LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO DEF & INTERESTED PARTIES; Doc # 45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketCONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; Doc # 43; SCRIBEAMERICA LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketCC CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; Doc # 44; MAILED TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB; Total Financial Assessment; 735.00; Total Payments and Credits; 735.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2019-18531; AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB; (85.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB; Total Financial Assessment; 735.00; Total Payments and Credits; 735.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; Doc # 41; SCRIBEAMERICA LLC - SENT TO JUDGE 072319; Party: AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketCASE REOPENED; Doc # 42

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Docket(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Doc # 38; OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD; (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN); Result: SC HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketDEFAULT-JUDGMENT UPON RECEIPT OF; Doc # 7; AFFDS IN PROOF OF COST, STATEMENT OF PRINCIPAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED; Doc # 6; Party: DOS SANTOS, JACKIE C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketNOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT; Doc # 3; Party: DOS SANTOS, JACKIE C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE; Doc # 5; Party: DOS SANTOS, JACKIE C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB; Total Financial Assessment; 735.00; Total Payments and Credits; 735.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2018-04040; AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB; (310.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB; Total Financial Assessment; 735.00; Total Payments and Credits; 735.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 2; W/ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where New Team LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ACHIEVA CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB, A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant