This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/13/2021 at 10:44:11 (UTC).

AMERICAN CLINICAL SOLUTIONS LLC Vs. THOMAS L HIDALGO, ALSO KNOWN AS THOMAS HIDALGO

Case Summary

On 11/26/2019 AMERICAN CLINICAL SOLUTIONS LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against THOMAS L HIDALGO, ALSO KNOWN AS THOMAS HIDALGO. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAGGER, EDWIN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6-SC

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAGGER, EDWIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN CLINICAL SOLUTIONS LLC

2775 Sunny Isles Blvd., Suite 100

Miami, FL 33160

Defendant

HIDALGO, THOMAS L ALSO KNOWN AS HIDALGO, THOMAS

Clearwater, FL 33765

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YANIQUE R HALL, ESQ

Attorney at SPRECHMAN & FISHER PA

2775 Sunny Isles Blvd Suite 100

Miami, FL 33160-4007

 

Court Documents

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice324120435-133

09/11/2020: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice324120435-132

09/11/2020: DISMISSAL NOTICE

AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES

02/24/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

02/24/2020: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

02/24/2020: AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

AFFIDAVIT OF INTEREST

02/24/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF INTEREST

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

02/24/2020: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL

10/26/2020: MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL

NOTICE RETURNED SERVED

12/17/2019: NOTICE RETURNED SERVED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/26/2019: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/26/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

11/26/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS DEFT PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

01/09/2020: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketMASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Doc # 15; HIDALGO, THOMAS L; Vol./Book 21227, Page 970, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION); Doc # 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketDISMISSAL-FAILURE TO PROSECUTE-SC; (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES; Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM; Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INTEREST; Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS; Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 12; W/ATTACHED STATUS REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES; Doc # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD; (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN); Result: SC HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketDEFAULT-JUDGMENT UPON RECEIPT OF; Doc # 8; AFFDS IN PROOF OF CLAIM, COST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; AMERICAN CLINICAL SOLUTIONS LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-44954; AMERICAN CLINICAL SOLUTIONS LLC; (310.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; AMERICAN CLINICAL SOLUTIONS LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketNOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT; Doc # 4; Party: HIDALGO, THOMAS L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE; Doc # 6; Party: HIDALGO, THOMAS L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 2; NOT USED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 3; WITH ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN CLINICAL SOLUTIONS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hall, Yanique Rachelle