This case was last updated from Pinellas County Courts on 12/25/2020 at 04:34:22 (UTC).

AMERICAN BUILDERS & CONTRACTORS SUPPLY CO INC Vs. NAKITARE BUILDERS LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 05/14/2015 AMERICAN BUILDERS CONTRACTORS SUPPLY CO INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NAKITARE BUILDERS LLC,. This case was filed in Pinellas County Courts, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAY, JACK. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3-CI

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAY, JACK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN BUILDERS & CONTRACTORS SUPPLY CO INC ABC SUPPLY CO INC TRADING AS

Defendants

MACK, LALISHA V

MACK, ROBERT S

NAKITARE BUILDERS LLC

Garnishees

SUNTRUST BANK

WELLS FARGO BANK N A

SEACOAST NATIONAL BANK

 

Court Documents

CORRESPONDENCE

01/14/2020: CORRESPONDENCE

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

07/24/2017: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

INTERROGATORIES

12/30/2015: INTERROGATORIES

(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

09/14/2016: (NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR PLURIES SUMMONS

11/13/2015: REQUEST FOR PLURIES SUMMONS

AFFIDAVIT

10/17/2016: AFFIDAVIT

ANSWER OF GARNISHEE

08/15/2017: ANSWER OF GARNISHEE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

09/01/2016: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

ATTACHMENT

12/16/2015: ATTACHMENT

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2020
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; AMERICAN BUILDERS & CONTRACTORS SUPPLY CO INC; Total Financial Assessment; 755.00; Total Payments and Credits; 755.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2020-01329; AMERICAN BUILDERS & CONTRACTORS SUPPLY CO INC; (10.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; AMERICAN BUILDERS & CONTRACTORS SUPPLY CO INC; Total Financial Assessment; 755.00; Total Payments and Credits; 755.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Doc # 5; TO CLERK REGARDING RECORDING SATISFACTION OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketSATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT (R); Doc # 6; STIPULATED; Vol./Book 20847, Page 2261, 1 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketORDER; Doc # 3; SUSTAINING EXEMPTIONS BY DEFT LALISHA V MACK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; Doc # 4; PROPOSED ORDER - RECEIVED BY COURT 102317

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Doc # 2; 101717 9:30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketCLAIM OF EXEMPTION AND REQUEST FOR HEARING; Doc # 1; (DEF ATTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; GARNISHMENT AND TENDER OF ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; OF SERVICE OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT SUNTRUST BANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
74 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2015
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; AMERICAN BUILDERS & CONTRACTORS SUPPLY CO INC; Total Financial Assessment; 755.00; Total Payments and Credits; 755.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2015-17915; AMERICAN BUILDERS & CONTRACTORS SUPPLY CO INC; (430.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2015
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; AMERICAN BUILDERS & CONTRACTORS SUPPLY CO INC; Total Financial Assessment; 755.00; Total Payments and Credits; 755.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 430.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • DocketATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT; EXHIBIT A STATEMENT OF ACCOUNT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • DocketATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT; EXHIBIT B APPLICATION AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; ISSUED ON 5/14/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; ISSUED ON 5/14/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; ISSUED ON 5/14/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SEACOAST NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where SUNTRUST BANKS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN BUILDERS & CONTRACTORS SUPPLY CO., INC., a corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant