This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 08/21/2021 at 08:03:35 (UTC).

AMERICAN BUILDERS AND CONTRACTORS SUPPLY CO INC Vs. HEROIC CONSTRUCTION LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 06/22/2021 AMERICAN BUILDERS AND CONTRACTORS SUPPLY CO INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HEROIC CONSTRUCTION LLC. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NEWTON, CYNTHIA J. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7-CI

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NEWTON, CYNTHIA J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN BUILDERS AND CONTRACTORS SUPPLY CO INC

1701 Dr Mlk Street North

St Petersburg, FL 33704

Defendants

BROWN, MICHAEL T, INDIVIDUALLY

Boynton Beach, FL 33436

HEROIC CONSTRUCTION LLC

4731 W Atlantic Avenue Suite B20

Delray Beach, FL 33445

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT E BURGUIERES, ESQ

Attorney at ROBERT E BURGUIERES PA

1701 Dr Mlk Jr St North

St Petersburg, FL 33704

Defendant Attorney

JOSHUA CHRISTENSEN, ESQ

Attorney at LAMPARIELLO LAW GROUP LLP

11369 Okeechobee Blvd Ste 400

Royal Palm Beach, FL 33411

 

Court Documents

DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

07/19/2021: DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/19/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

08/10/2021: ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

SUMMONS - SERVED

07/06/2021: SUMMONS - SERVED

SUMMONS - SERVED

07/06/2021: SUMMONS - SERVED

SUMMONS - ISSUED

06/22/2021: SUMMONS - ISSUED

SUMMONS - ISSUED

06/22/2021: SUMMONS - ISSUED

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

06/22/2021: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

COMPLAINT

06/22/2021: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

06/22/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF; Doc # 10; Party: HEROIC CONSTRUCTION LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 8; AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Party: BROWN, MICHAEL T, INDIVIDUALLY; Party: HEROIC CONSTRUCTION LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketDEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Doc # 9; TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 6; 06292021; Party: HEROIC CONSTRUCTION LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 7; 06292021; Party: BROWN, MICHAEL T, INDIVIDUALLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; AMERICAN BUILDERS AND CONTRACTORS SUPPLY CO INC; Total Financial Assessment; 420.00; Total Payments and Credits; 420.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-24662; AMERICAN BUILDERS AND CONTRACTORS SUPPLY CO INC; (420.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; AMERICAN BUILDERS AND CONTRACTORS SUPPLY CO INC; Total Financial Assessment; 420.00; Total Payments and Credits; 420.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2; WITH ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 4; Party: HEROIC CONSTRUCTION LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 5; Party: BROWN, MICHAEL T, INDIVIDUALLY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN BUILDERS & CONTRACTORS SUPPLY CO., INC., a corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERT E BURGUIERES