Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 06/21/2021 at 08:21:02 (UTC).

AMERICAN BUILDERS AND CONTRACTORS SUPPLY CO INC Vs. ATLANTIC WINDOW AND DOORS LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 04/22/2021 AMERICAN BUILDERS AND CONTRACTORS SUPPLY CO INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ATLANTIC WINDOW AND DOORS LLC. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAMS, AMY M. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4-CI

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAMS, AMY M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMERICAN BUILDERS AND CONTRACTORS SUPPLY CO INC

1701 Dr Mlk Street North

St Petersburg, FL 33704

AMERICAN BUILDERS AND CONTRACTORS SUPPLY CO INC TRADING AS ABC SUPPLY CO INC

1701 Dr Mlk Street North

St Petersburg, FL 33704

Defendants

VAGLICA, ROCCO

Oak Hill, FL 32759

ATLANTIC WINDOW AND DOORS LLC

5575 S Semoran Blvd Suite 36

Orlando, FL 32822

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT E BURGUIERES, ESQ

Attorney at ROBERT E BURGUIERES PA

1701 Dr Mlk Jr St North

St Petersburg, FL 33704

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS - SERVED

05/26/2021: SUMMONS - SERVED

SUMMONS - SERVED

05/10/2021: SUMMONS - SERVED

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

04/22/2021: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

SUMMONS - ISSUED

04/22/2021: SUMMONS - ISSUED

SUMMONS - ISSUED

04/22/2021: SUMMONS - ISSUED

COMPLAINT E-FILED

04/22/2021: COMPLAINT E-FILED

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

04/22/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 7; 05142021; Party: VAGLICA, ROCCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 6; 05042021; Party: ATLANTIC WINDOW AND DOORS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; AMERICAN BUILDERS AND CONTRACTORS SUPPLY CO INC; Total Financial Assessment; 420.00; Total Payments and Credits; 420.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-15979; AMERICAN BUILDERS AND CONTRACTORS SUPPLY CO INC; (420.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; AMERICAN BUILDERS AND CONTRACTORS SUPPLY CO INC; Total Financial Assessment; 420.00; Total Payments and Credits; 420.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT E-FILED; Doc # 2; CONSOLIDATED STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 3; Party: VAGLICA, ROCCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 4; Party: ATLANTIC WINDOW AND DOORS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN BUILDERS & CONTRACTORS SUPPLY CO., INC., a corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERT E BURGUIERES