Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/12/2021 at 06:04:19 (UTC).

ALICIA MARIE BELL Vs. SHANICE ALEXIS BELL

Case Summary

On 10/07/2019 ALICIA MARIE BELL filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SHANICE ALEXIS BELL. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, 501 Building St Petersburg - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9-FD

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    501 Building St Petersburg - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BELL, ALICIA MARIE

St Petersburg, FL 33713

Respondent

BELL, SHANICE ALEXIS

Clearwater, FL 33759

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • FinancialPETITIONER; BELL, ALICIA MARIE; Total Financial Assessment; 424.00; Total Payments and Credits; 424.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # SB-2020-00058; BELL, ALICIA MARIE; (3.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • FinancialPETITIONER; BELL, ALICIA MARIE; Total Financial Assessment; 424.00; Total Payments and Credits; 424.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketRETURNED FROM POST OFFICE; Doc # 12; FINAL JUDGMENT OF SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketCERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK; Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketCC JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES; Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketSIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION HEARING; (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer KELLY, LORRAINE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION (SRS); Doc # 9; Vol./Book 20763, Page 1823, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • FinancialPETITIONER; BELL, ALICIA MARIE; Total Financial Assessment; 424.00; Total Payments and Credits; 424.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # SB-2019-16605; BELL, ALICIA MARIE; (421.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • FinancialPETITIONER; BELL, ALICIA MARIE; Total Financial Assessment; 424.00; Total Payments and Credits; 424.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • FinancialPETITIONER; BELL, ALICIA MARIE; Total Financial Assessment; 424.00; Total Payments and Credits; 424.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 414.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION REGARDING PARTIES; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketSEALED SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER PLAINTIFF - PETITIONER; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketSEALED SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER DEFENDANT - RESPONDENT; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE; Doc # 7; Party: BELL, ALICIA MARIE; Party: BELL, SHANICE ALEXIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less