This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/04/2020 at 08:05:07 (UTC).

ALFREDO GUTIERREZ, et al Vs. CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 ALFREDO GUTIERREZ filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JIROTKA, GEORGE M. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6-CI

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JIROTKA, GEORGE M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GUTIERREZ, BETZAIDA

Seminole, FL 33776

GUTIERREZ, ALFREDO

Seminole, FL 33776

Defendant

CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DAVID LOW

Attorney at DAVID LOW & ASSOCIATES PA

2101 West Commercial Blvd Suite 2800

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

DAVID LOW, ESQ

Attorney at DAVID LOW & ASSOCIATES P A

2101 W Commercial Blvd Ste 2800

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

Defendant Attorney

JESSICA L MURRAY, ESQ

Attorney at KUBICKI DRAPER

400 N Ashley Dr Ste 1200

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

NOTICE-SERVICE-PROCESS INS COMM

12/12/2019: NOTICE-SERVICE-PROCESS INS COMM

COMPLAINT

12/06/2019: COMPLAINT

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/27/2020: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/06/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/06/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

12/30/2019: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/30/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE-SERVICE-PROCESS INS COMM

12/12/2019: NOTICE-SERVICE-PROCESS INS COMM

NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

01/27/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/06/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/06/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

PRIVILEGE LOG

01/27/2020: PRIVILEGE LOG

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/28/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/28/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/27/2020: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

12/30/2019: ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/28/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/06/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketPRIVILEGE LOG; Doc # 14; DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 9; Party: CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF; Doc # 11; Party: CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketNOTICE-SERVICE-PROCESS INS COMM; Doc # 7; 120919 CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; GUTIERREZ, ALFREDO; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-46055; GUTIERREZ, ALFREDO; (410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; GUTIERREZ, ALFREDO; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 2; ISSUED; Party: CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 3; WITH ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less