This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 04/05/2021 at 08:23:03 (UTC).

ALEXANDRE BOERMA Vs. JAY HARVEY WEINSTEIN

Case Summary

On 02/04/2021 ALEXANDRE BOERMA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JAY HARVEY WEINSTEIN. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MEYER, KEITH. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7-CI

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MEYER, KEITH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOERMA, ALEXANDRE

Clearwater, FL 33756

Defendant

WEINSTEIN, JAY HARVEY

Clearwater Beach, FL 33767

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAUL PUZZANGHERA, ESQ

Attorney at PUZZANGHERA LAW OFFICES

1471 South Missouri Ave

Clearwater, FL 33756

Defendant Attorney

NATHANIEL FISHER, ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ELLEN H EHRENPREIS

4300 W Cypress St Ste 900

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

03/19/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

03/19/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/04/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

03/04/2021: ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/19/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

SUMMONS - ISSUED

02/04/2021: SUMMONS - ISSUED

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/04/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/04/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/04/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

02/04/2021: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

COMPLAINT

02/04/2021: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

02/04/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF; Doc # 9; Party: WEINSTEIN, JAY HARVEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BOERMA, ALEXANDRE; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-04827; BOERMA, ALEXANDRE; (410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BOERMA, ALEXANDRE; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 7; Party: WEINSTEIN, JAY HARVEY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FISHER, NATHANIEL CHARLES