This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/19/2023 at 15:53:14 (UTC).

ALEX PARKER GOODRIDGE Vs. STEVE ARLON BAXLEY, et al

Case Summary

On 09/15/2022 ALEX PARKER GOODRIDGE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STEVE ARLON BAXLEY,. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MEYER, KEITH. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2-CI

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MEYER, KEITH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOODRIDGE, ALEX PARKER

Tampa, FL 33606

Not Yet Classified and Defendants

BAXLEY, STEVE ARLON

Bartow, FL 33830

DUKE ENERGY FLORIDA LLC

299 1St Avenue North

St Petersburg, FL 33701

ELITE CONSTRUCTION OF OCALA LLC

2240 North Pine Avenue

Ocala, FL 34475

ROUNTREE TRANSPORT AND RIGGING INC

2460 Lane Avenue N

Jacksonville, FL 32254

ROUNTREE TRANSPORT & RIGGING INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN C DISTASIO, ESQ

Attorney at FLORIDA LAW GROUP

407 North Howard Ave Suite 100

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

BRAULIO M. RODRIGUEZ, ESQ

Attorney at CRUSER, MITCHELL, NOVITZ, SANCHEZ, GASTON & ZMET, LLP

121 S Oange Anue, Suite 1500

Orlando, FL 32801

DANIEL S LIEBOWITZ, ESQ

Attorney at CRUSER MITCHELL NOVITZ

121 S Orange Ave Ste 1500

Orlando, FL 32801

GERARD P DUIGNAN, ESQ

Attorney at BLEAKLEY BAVOL DENMAN

15316 N Florida Ave

Tampa, FL 33613

ROBERT J GRACE, ESQ

15170 North Florida Ave

Tampa, FL 33613

 

Court Documents

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

10/31/2022: ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

10/28/2022: ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

10/27/2022: ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

10/27/2022: ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/24/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

JOINT STIPULATION

10/19/2022: JOINT STIPULATION

SUMMONS - SERVED

10/13/2022: SUMMONS - SERVED

JOINT STIPULATION

10/11/2022: JOINT STIPULATION

JOINT STIPULATION

10/05/2022: JOINT STIPULATION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/30/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/30/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

OBJECTION

11/30/2022: OBJECTION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/30/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

11/30/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/30/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/30/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/30/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/30/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER; Doc # 55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 42; AND SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORY TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 43; (FIRST SET)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 44; (COLLATERAL SOURCE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 45; (MEDICARE-MEDICAID REPORTING)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 46; (FIRST)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 47; (COLLATERAL SOURCE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 48; (MEDICARE-MEDICAID)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 49

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 9; AS TO DUKE ENERGY FLORIDA LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 10; AS TO ELITE CONSTRUCTION OF OCALA LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 11; AS TO ELITE CONSTRUCTION OF OCALA LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 12; AS TO ELITE CONSTRUCTION OF OCALA LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 13; AS TO ROUNTREE TRANSPORT AND RIGGING INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 14; AS TO ROUNTREE TRANSPORT AND RIGGING INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 15; AS TO ROUNTREE TRASPORT AND RIGGING INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 16; AS TO STEVE ARLEN BAXLEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 17; AS TO STEVE ARLON BAXLEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 18; AS TO STEVE ARLON BAXLEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less