This case was last updated from Pinellas County Courts on 03/12/2022 at 08:18:23 (UTC).

ALDO BOLLIGER Vs. SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA INC, REGISTERED AGENT OR OWNER CT CORPORATION SYSTEM

Case Summary

On 01/11/2022 ALDO BOLLIGER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA INC, REGISTERED AGENT OR OWNER CT CORPORATION SYSTEM. This case was filed in Pinellas County Courts, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1-SC

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOLLIGER, ALDO

St Petersburg, FL 33701

Defendant

SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA INC REGISTERED AGENT OR OWNER CT CORPORATION SYSTEM

1200 South Pine Island Rd

Plantation, FL 33324

 

Court Documents

COVID ZOOM 1ST HEARING - THURSDAY - SC PRETRIAL - PLTF

02/07/2022: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL

COVID ZOOM 1ST HEARING - THURSDAY - SC PRETRIAL - DEFT

COVID ZOOM 1ST HEARING - THURSDAY - SC PRETRIAL - DEFT

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/11/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

REQUEST FOR ALIAS NOTICE TO APPEAR

02/11/2022: REQUEST FOR ALIAS NOTICE TO APPEAR

COVID ZOOM ALIAS - THURSDAY - SC PRETRIAL - PLTF

02/11/2022: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

COVID ZOOM ALIAS - THURSDAY - SC PRETRIAL - DEFT

02/11/2022: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL; (11:30 AM) (Judicial Officer SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketCANCELED; SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL; (11:30 AM) (Judicial Officer SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH); DATA ENTRY ERROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ALIAS NOTICE TO APPEAR; Doc # 5; Party: BOLLIGER, ALDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BOLLIGER, ALDO; Total Financial Assessment; 321.46; Total Payments and Credits; 321.46; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # SB-2022-01390; BOLLIGER, ALDO; (10.73)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BOLLIGER, ALDO; Total Financial Assessment; 321.46; Total Payments and Credits; 321.46; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 10.73

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD; (3:30 PM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN); Result: SC HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONTINUED PEND SERVICE; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketNOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT; Doc # 3; MAILED TO PLAINTIFF FOR PROCESS SERVICE; Party: SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BOLLIGER, ALDO; Total Financial Assessment; 321.46; Total Payments and Credits; 321.46; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # SB-2022-00349; BOLLIGER, ALDO; (310.73)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BOLLIGER, ALDO; Total Financial Assessment; 321.46; Total Payments and Credits; 321.46; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 0.73

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BOLLIGER, ALDO; Total Financial Assessment; 321.46; Total Payments and Credits; 321.46; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Samsung Electronics America, Inc. is a litigant