This case was last updated from Pinellas County Courts on 01/06/2021 at 03:56:29 (UTC).

AEGIS FINANCIAL ADVISOR Vs. JERRY TUCKER, et al

Case Summary

On 09/21/2016 AEGIS FINANCIAL ADVISOR filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JERRY TUCKER,. This case was filed in Pinellas County Courts, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McNARY, MYRA SCOTT. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5-CO

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McNARY, MYRA SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AEGIS FINANCIAL ADVISOR

Defendants

MARTIN, DEBBIE

TUCKER, JERRY

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

ANSWER OF

10/06/2016: ANSWER OF

CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

10/28/2016: CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

11/15/2016: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

SUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER

09/21/2016: SUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/21/2016: CIVIL COVER SHEET

ATTACHMENT

09/21/2016: ATTACHMENT

PLTF PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

10/11/2016: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

ORDER - NOT SIGNED BY COURT

10/20/2016: ORDER - NOT SIGNED BY COURT

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2016
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION; RETD UNEXECUTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION; ISSUED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • DocketJUDGMENT (SRS)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION; Vol./Book 19413, Page 2364, 1 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • DocketATTORNEY COVER LETTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • DocketORDER DENYING; DEFTS MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT / FINDING DEFTS IN DEFAULT OF COUNT I

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; / EMAIL ADDRESS OF PLTFS COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; LANDLORD - PRO SE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; 111016 10:30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; AS COUNSEL FOR PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; 092816; Party: MARTIN, DEBBIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; AEGIS FINANCIAL ADVISOR; Total Financial Assessment; 210.30; Total Payments and Credits; 210.30; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # SB-2016-11134; AEGIS FINANCIAL ADVISOR; (205.60)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; AEGIS FINANCIAL ADVISOR; Total Financial Assessment; 210.30; Total Payments and Credits; 210.30; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 0.60

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; AEGIS FINANCIAL ADVISOR; Total Financial Assessment; 210.30; Total Payments and Credits; 210.30; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 205.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - 1 COUNT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • DocketATTACHMENT; THREE DAY NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION OF CORPORATE OFFICER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER; Party: MARTIN, DEBBIE; Party: TUCKER, JERRY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Party: MARTIN, DEBBIE; Party: TUCKER, JERRY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less