This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 11/12/2022 at 06:39:21 (UTC).

949 CLEVELAND STREET LLC Vs. BAKER BARRIOS ARCHITECTS INC, et al

Case Summary

On 07/22/2019 949 CLEVELAND STREET LLC filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against BAKER BARRIOS ARCHITECTS INC,. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAMS, AMY M. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0-CI

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAMS, AMY M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

949 CLEVELAND STREET LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

C/O Michael Niederst 151 Southhall Lane Suite 150

Maitland, FL 32751

Defendants

BAKER BARRIOS ARCHITECTS INC A FLORIDA CORPORATION

189 S Orange Ave, Suite 1700

Orlando, FL 32801

B AND W STRUCTURAL DESIGNS LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

201 N. Franklin Street, Suite 1970

Tampa, FL 33602

PROSPECT CONSTRUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT GROUP LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

4130 United Avenue

Mt. Dora, FL 32757

ZMG CONSTRUCTION INC A FLORIDA CORPORATION

1540 International Parkway, Suite 2000

Lake Mary, FL 32746

Not Yet Classified

ZEPHYR FLIGHT INC DOING BUSINESS AS CMIC

KANCOR COMPANIES LLC

RANDY GRULKE FABRICATION AND SERVICES INC

REKS AND SON CONTRACTING LLC

DAVID KNIGHT STUCCO INC

DOERS WINDOW MANUFACTURING LLC

CANVAS SHOP INC

KANCOR MULTI-FAMILY LLC

ZE CONSTRUCTION LLC

17 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DAVID F TEGELER, ESQ

Attorney at SASSO & SASSO PA

1031 W Morse Blvd Ste 120

Winter Park, FL 32789

MICHAEL A SASSO, ESQ

Attorney at SASSO & SASSO P A

1031 W Morse Blvd Ste 120

Winter Park, FL 32789

KEVIN T MCGAVOCK

Attorney at SASSO AND SASSO P A

1031 West Morse Blvd Ste 120

Winter Park, FL 32789

CHRISTIAN BONTA

Attorney at SASSO AND SASSO P A

1031 West Morse Blvd Ste 120

Winter Park, FL 32789

Defendant Attorneys

DAVID WAYNE NILSEN, ESQ

Attorney at CONROY SIMBERG

201 East Kennedy Blvd Suite 900

Tampa, FL 33602

MICHAEL KRAFT, ESQ

Attorney at CONROY SIMBERG

201 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 900

Tampa, FL 33602

MATTHEW C NEFF, ESQ

Attorney at SAYDAH LAW FIRM

2572 West S.R. 426 Suite 3024

Oviedo, FL 32765

NEIL A SAYDAH

Attorney at SAYDAH LAW FIRM

7250 Red Bug Lake Road Suite 1012

Oviedo, FL 32765

Other Attorneys

CARY A CASH, ESQ

Attorney at FREEMAN GOLDIS & CASH P A

P O Box 12349

St Petersburg, FL 33733

MONAL OZA ZIPPER

JENNIFER L SHIPPOLE, ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JENNIFER L SHIPPOLE

14050 Nw 14Th St Ste 180

Sunrise, FL 33323

26 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE

03/11/2022: NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE

NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE

03/11/2022: NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

03/11/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

03/11/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

03/11/2022: ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

DISCLOSURE

03/11/2022: DISCLOSURE

WITNESS LIST

03/11/2022: WITNESS LIST

ORDER

03/10/2022: ORDER

ORDER DENYING

03/10/2022: ORDER DENYING

EXHIBIT

11/10/2022: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

11/10/2022: EXHIBIT

NOTICE OF HEARING

11/09/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

11/09/2022: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION

11/08/2022: MOTION

REQUEST

11/07/2022: REQUEST

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/07/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION

11/04/2022: MOTION

MOTION

11/03/2022: MOTION

783 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Doc # 798; SUPPLEMENTAL MATERIAL IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITH ATTACHMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 799; LETTER TO MICHAEL NIEDERST RE LIMITED INSPECTION OF WI FI CAFE WITH ATTACHMENTS; Party: 949 CLEVELAND STREET LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 800; WINDOWS AND PATIO DOORS WATER INFILTRATION TESTING REPORT; Party: 949 CLEVELAND STREET LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING; Doc # 796; (SECOND) 12022022 10:30 ZOOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Doc # 797; (CROSS) 12022022 10:30 ZOOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketMOTION; Doc # 795; FOR TRIAL E NOVO; Filed by: DAVID KNIGHT STUCCO INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 793; (SECOND AMENDED); Party: DAVID KNIGHT STUCCO INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketREQUEST; Doc # 794; FOR TRIAL DE NOVO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketMOTION; Doc # 792; FOR TRIAL DE NOVO; Filed by: RANDY GRULKE FABRICATION AND SERVICES INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketMOTION TO SET TRIAL; Doc # 789; Party: PROSPECT CONSTRUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT GROUP LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
803 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketDEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS; Doc # 9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 7; Party: ZMG CONSTRUCTION INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; 949 CLEVELAND STREET LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 945.00; Total Payments and Credits; 945.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-27545; 949 CLEVELAND STREET LLC; (440.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; 949 CLEVELAND STREET LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 945.00; Total Payments and Credits; 945.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 440.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2; WITH ATTACHMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 3; ISSUED; Party: BAKER BARRIOS ARCHITECTS INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 4; ISSUED; Party: B AND W STRUCTURAL DESIGNS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 5; ISSUED; Party: ZMG CONSTRUCTION INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 6; ISSUED; Party: PROSPECT CONSTRUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT GROUP LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ZE CONSTRUCTION LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where KANCOR COMPANIES LLC is a litigant