This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/04/2020 at 08:04:06 (UTC).

2616 EMERSON AVE S LAND TRUST CORPORATE MIDWEST INVESTMENT LLC TRE Vs. GLEN AUTO

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 2616 EMERSON AVE S LAND TRUST CORPORATE MIDWEST INVESTMENT LLC TRE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GLEN AUTO. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAGGER, EDWIN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1-CO

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAGGER, EDWIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

2616 EMERSON AVE S LAND TRUST CORPORATE MIDWEST INVESTMENT LLC TRE

2900 18Th Ave South

St Petersburg, FL 33712

Defendant

AUTO, GLEN

2616 Emerson Ave South

St Petersburg, FL 33712

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION

01/02/2020: WRIT OF POSSESSION

CERT OF MAILING - CO

12/06/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER

12/06/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER

DEFAULT ENTERED

12/18/2019: DEFAULT ENTERED

WRIT OF POSSESSION

01/10/2020: WRIT OF POSSESSION

PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

12/16/2019: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT

12/16/2019: AFFIDAVIT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

12/11/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

12/19/2019: FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT

12/16/2019: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM - FDFM

12/19/2019: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

12/19/2019: FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 19; NOT EXECUTED- CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketDEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO); Doc # 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM; Doc # 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION; Doc # 17; Vol./Book 20826, Page 2508, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED; Doc # 13; CT 1; Party: AUTO, GLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketUNSIGNED ORDER SENT TO JUDGE; Doc # 14; FINAL JUDGMENT W/ 1 ENV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Doc # 10; - CT I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Doc # 11; IN PROOF OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE - CT I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT; Doc # 12; ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; 2616 EMERSON AVE S LAND TRUST CORPORATE MIDWEST INVESTMENT LLC TRE; Total Financial Assessment; 195.00; Total Payments and Credits; 195.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # SB-2019-20211; 2616 EMERSON AVE S LAND TRUST CORPORATE MIDWEST INVESTMENT LLC TRE; (195.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; 2616 EMERSON AVE S LAND TRUST CORPORATE MIDWEST INVESTMENT LLC TRE; Total Financial Assessment; 195.00; Total Payments and Credits; 195.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER; Doc # 1; Party: AUTO, GLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Doc # 2; Party: AUTO, GLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - II COUNTS; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO REPRESENT; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketTHREE DAY NOTICE; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketATTACHMENT; Doc # 7; STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNOTICE; Doc # 8; PERMANENT MAILING ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less