This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/09/2019 at 08:06:52 (UTC).

2000 GANDY BLVD LLC Vs. KEVIN WILLIAMS

Case Summary

On 12/11/2018 2000 GANDY BLVD LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against KEVIN WILLIAMS. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McNARY, MYRA SCOTT. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1-CO

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McNARY, MYRA SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

2000 GANDY BLVD LLC

307 S. Fielding Ave

Tampa, FL 33606-4121

2000 GANDY BLVD LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS LANDLORD FOR CRESCENT LAKE APARTMENTS

307 S. Fielding Ave

Tampa, FL 33606-4121

Defendant

WILLIAMS, KEVIN

St. Petersburg, FL 33702

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHARLES V BARRETT, III

Attorney at CHARLES V BARRETT PA

307 South Fielding Ave

Tampa, FL 33606-4121

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION

01/07/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

01/07/2019: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

JUDGMENT

01/03/2019: JUDGMENT

WRIT OF POSSESSION

01/15/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION

PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

12/21/2018: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

VERIFICATION. OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

12/21/2018: VERIFICATION. OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

12/21/2018: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT

12/26/2018: DEFAULT ENTERED

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

12/12/2018: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER

12/12/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER

LEASE

12/11/2018: LEASE

THREE DAY NOTICE

12/11/2018: THREE DAY NOTICE

COMPLAINT

12/11/2018: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

12/11/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2019
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 15; EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; Doc # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 14; ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • JUDGMENT; Doc # 12; FOR POSSESSION IN FAVOR OF PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED; Doc # 11; Party: WILLIAMS, KEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED; Doc # 7; 12/13/18; Party: WILLIAMS, KEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • VERIFICATION. OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT; Doc # 9; COUNT I - ENTERED; Party: 2000 GANDY BLVD LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER; Doc # 5; Party: WILLIAMS, KEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Doc # 6; Party: WILLIAMS, KEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • COMPLAINT; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • THREE DAY NOTICE; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • LEASE; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • PLAINTIFF; 2000 GANDY BLVD LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 195.00; Total Payments and Credits; 195.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # SB-2018-13204; BARRETT, CHARLES V, III; (10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • PLAINTIFF; 2000 GANDY BLVD LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 195.00; Total Payments and Credits; 195.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • PLAINTIFF; 2000 GANDY BLVD LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 195.00; Total Payments and Credits; 195.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2018-44940; 2000 GANDY BLVD LLC; (185.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • PLAINTIFF; 2000 GANDY BLVD LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 195.00; Total Payments and Credits; 195.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less