Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/11/2021 at 23:25:40 (UTC).

11300 66TH STREET NORTH LLC Vs. LESLIE S JONES

Case Summary

On 09/27/2019 11300 66TH STREET NORTH LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LESLIE S JONES. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARASSAS, JOHN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9-CO

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARASSAS, JOHN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

11300 66TH STREET NORTH LLC

307 S. Fielding Ave

Tampa, FL 33606-4121

11300 66TH STREET NORTH LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS LANDLORD OF PARK VILLAGE APARTMENTS

307 S. Fielding Ave

Tampa, FL 33606-4121

Defendant

JONES, LESLIE S

Largo, FL 33773

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHARLES V BARRETT, III

Attorney at CHARLES V. BARRETT, P.A.

307 S Fielding Ave

Tampa, FL 33606-4121

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

10/18/2019: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

WRIT OF POSSESSION

10/18/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION

FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

10/16/2019: FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

WRIT OF POSSESSION

10/31/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION

FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

10/16/2019: FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

10/09/2019: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

10/09/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

VERIFICATION. OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

10/09/2019: VERIFICATION. OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

10/11/2019: DEFAULT ENTERED

CERT OF MAILING - CO

09/30/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER

09/30/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER

ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

09/27/2019: ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE

09/27/2019: NOTICE

COMPLAINT

09/27/2019: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

09/27/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 16; RETD EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 14; ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM; Doc # 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketDEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO); Doc # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION; Doc # 13; Vol./Book 20737, Page 2533, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED; Doc # 11; CT I; Party: JONES, LESLIE S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketVERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - POSTED; Doc # 8; 09/30/19; Party: JONES, LESLIE S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Doc # 9; ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Doc # 10; Party: 11300 66TH STREET NORTH LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; 11300 66TH STREET NORTH LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 195.00; Total Payments and Credits; 195.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # SB-2019-16089; BARRETT, CHARLES V, III; (10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; 11300 66TH STREET NORTH LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 195.00; Total Payments and Credits; 195.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER; Doc # 5; Party: JONES, LESLIE S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Doc # 6; Party: JONES, LESLIE S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; 11300 66TH STREET NORTH LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 195.00; Total Payments and Credits; 195.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-36988; 11300 66TH STREET NORTH LLC; (185.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; 11300 66TH STREET NORTH LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 195.00; Total Payments and Credits; 195.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketNOTICE; Doc # 3; THREE DAY NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT; Doc # 4; LEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 11300 66TH STREET NORTH LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHARLES V BARRETT, III