Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/19/2018 at 21:29:51 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK N A Vs. JACOB HERMAN et al

Case Summary

On 08/14/2009 WELLS FARGO BANK N A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JACOB HERMAN. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0-CI

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WELLS FARGO BANK N A AS TRUSTEE FOR WAMU MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES SE

WELLS FARGO BANK N A AS TRUSTEE FOR WAMU MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES

Defendants

UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 2

ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES

HERMAN, JACOB

Tarpon Springs, FL 34689

KRAVITZ, ALAN S

Brooklyn, NY 11214

KRAVITZ, PAULINE IZZO

Tarpon Springs, FL 34689

SIMMS, JOHN S, ESQ

STAACK SIMS AND HERNANDEZ PA

WRIGHT, LISA FORMERLY KNOWN AS UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 1

Tarpon Springs, FL 34689

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BARBARA A COUTURE

Attorney at SHAPIRO FISHMAN GACHE LLP

4630 Woodland Corp Blvd Suite 100

Tampa, FL 33614

GRAHAM M SMITH

Attorney at WARGO AND FRENCH LLP

201 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 1000

Miami, FL 33131

SIMON FERRO

Attorney at WARGO AND FRENCH LLP

201 S Biscayne Blvd Suite 1000

Miami, FL 33131

JAMES J SPANOLIOS

Attorney at SHAPIRO FISHMAN GACHE LLP

4630 Woodland Corp Blvd Ste 100

Tampa, FL 33614

MEGHAN A KENEFIC

Attorney at SHAPIRO FISHMAN GACHE LLP

4630 Woodland Corp Blvd Ste 100

Tampa, FL 33614

DANIEL WHITNEY, ESQ

Attorney at SHAPIRO FISHMAN GACHE LLP

4630 Woodland Corp Blvd Ste 100

Tampa, FL 33614

Defendant Attorneys

JAMES A STAACK

900 Drew St Suite 1

Clearwater, FL 33755

JAMES A STAACK, ESQ

Attorney at STAACK SIMMS AND REIGHARD PLLC

900 Drew St Ste 1

Clearwater, FL 33755

ANDREW M WIECZORKOWSKI

 

Court Documents

PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE

01/05/2018: PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE

ATTACHMENT

12/29/2017: ATTACHMENT

PLTF PET'S MOTION

12/14/2017: PLTF-PET'S MOTION

AFFIDAVIT

09/20/2017: AFFIDAVIT

MF-ADDITIONAL FILING FEE SERVICE CHARGE OWED

08/11/2017: CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE

AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

06/13/2017: AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

05/05/2017: CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

PLTF PET'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW

03/29/2017: PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW

COPY

02/06/2017: COPY

PLTF PET'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

01/18/2016: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/23/2015: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

10/10/2014: NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

09/22/2014: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

PLTF PET'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

09/22/2014: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO-COUNSEL

05/15/2014: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO-COUNSEL

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

02/25/2014: NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

12/30/2013: NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

CERTIFICATE OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY

12/30/2013: CERTIFICATE OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY

100 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2018
  • ORDER; Doc # 30; CLOSING CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • COPY CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE; Doc # 29; REOPEN FEE DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • CERTIFICATE OF TITLE; Doc # 27; Vol./Book 19925, Page 508, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT; Doc # 28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • EMERGENCY MOTION; Doc # 26; (DUPLICATE) TO CANCEL SALE/MTN SET ASIDE FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE; (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL); REC VER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • CERTIFICATE OF SALE; Doc # 23; WELLS FARGO BANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • EMERGENCY MOTION; Doc # 24; TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE; Party: WRIGHT, LISA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • ORDER DENYING; Doc # 25; EMERGENCY MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • CASE REOPENED

    Read MoreRead Less
312 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2017
  • PLAINTIFF; WELLS FARGO BANK N A; Total Financial Assessment; 1,504.40; Total Payments and Credits; 1,504.40; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2017-35283; WELLS FARGO BANK N A; (49.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • PLAINTIFF; WELLS FARGO BANK N A; Total Financial Assessment; 1,504.40; Total Payments and Credits; 1,504.40; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 49.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • PLAINTIFF; WELLS FARGO BANK N A; Total Financial Assessment; 1,504.40; Total Payments and Credits; 1,504.40; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2017-34690; WELLS FARGO BANK N A; (50.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • PLAINTIFF; WELLS FARGO BANK N A; Total Financial Assessment; 1,504.40; Total Payments and Credits; 1,504.40; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • PLAINTIFF; WELLS FARGO BANK N A; Total Financial Assessment; 1,504.40; Total Payments and Credits; 1,504.40; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2017-33255; SHAPIRO FISHMAN; (49.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • PLAINTIFF; WELLS FARGO BANK N A; Total Financial Assessment; 1,504.40; Total Payments and Credits; 1,504.40; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 49.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2013
  • PLAINTIFF; WELLS FARGO BANK N A; Total Financial Assessment; 1,504.40; Total Payments and Credits; 1,504.40; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2013-65374; WRIGHT, LISA; (10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2013
  • PLAINTIFF; WELLS FARGO BANK N A; Total Financial Assessment; 1,504.40; Total Payments and Credits; 1,504.40; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • DEFENDANT; HERMAN, JACOB; Total Financial Assessment; 0.45; Total Payments and Credits; 0.45; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-04764; HERMAN, JACOB; (0.45)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • DEFENDANT; HERMAN, JACOB; Total Financial Assessment; 0.45; Total Payments and Credits; 0.45; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less