This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/21/2018 at 15:54:48 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION vs. MELISSA RODGERS, et al

Case Summary

On 12/22/2009 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MELISSA RODGERS. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHAEFER, JOHN A. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4-CI

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHAEFER, JOHN A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

DOE, JANE

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MELISSA RODGERS

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES

CROSSINGS AT LAKE TARPON HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

2180 West Sr 434 Suite 5000

Longwood, FL 32779

FLORIDA STATE OF DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

Tallahassee, FL 32399

MENIKH, DAN FORMERLY KNOWN AS DOE, JOHN

Palm Harbor, FL 34684

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC AS NOMINEE FOR ALTERNATIVE MORTGAGE FUNDING CORP

RODGERS, MELISSA

Palm Harbor, FL 34684

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ASHLEY L SIMON

Attorney at KASS SHULER P A

1505 N Florida Ave

Tampa, FL 33601

FRANCES E JOHNSON

1511 N Westshore Blvd Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

GRACE S SANTOS

Attorney at KASS SHULER

800 1505 N Florida Ave

Tampa, FL 33601

FRANCES E JOHNSON, ESQ

Attorney at KELLEY KRONENBERG

1511 N Westshore Blvd Ste 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorneys

LESLIE M CONKLIN

1433 S Ft Harrison Ave Suite B

Clearwater, FL 33756

LESLIE M CONKLIN, ESQ

1433 S Fort Harrison Ave Ste B

Clearwater, FL 33756

NIURKA FERNANDEZ ASMER

113 S Blvd Suite 100

Tampa, FL 33606

NIURKA FERNANDEZ ASMER, ESQ

Attorney at FL LEGAL GROUP

501 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 810

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

DISMISSAL NOTICE

05/20/2016: DISMISSAL NOTICE

COPY CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE

06/28/2016: COPY CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE

EXHIBIT

03/05/2015: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

01/14/2015: EXHIBIT

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/31/2014: NOTICE OF HEARING

PLTF PET'S MOTION

11/17/2014: PLTF-PET'S MOTION

PLTF PET'S MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT

11/11/2014: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT

AMENDED COMPLAINT

09/11/2014: AMENDED COMPLAINT

PLTF PET'S MOTION TO AMEND

08/13/2014: PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO AMEND

NOTICE

04/01/2014: NOTICE

COPY

03/17/2014: COPY

DEF RESP'S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

03/04/2014: DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

NOTICE OF HEARING

02/25/2014: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF FILING

02/07/2014: NOTICE OF FILING

EXHIBIT

02/06/2014: EXHIBIT

ORDER SCHEDULING NON-JURY TRIAL

12/18/2013: ORDER SCHEDULING NON-JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL

07/16/2013: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL

REQUEST FOR

04/12/2013: REQUEST FOR

80 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2018
  • NOTICE OF FORFEITURE OF UNCLAIMED MONEY UNDER F.S.116.21; Doc # 1; 2018 REPORT PUBLICATION DATE 07/27/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • CANCELED; DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION; (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer SCHAEFER, JOHN A); CASE DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • COPY CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE; RETURNING CHECK - NO FEE TO RECORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • RETURNED ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • ORDER; DISMISSING ACTION / RELEASE LIS PENDEDNS / RETURN ORIG DOCS; Vol./Book 19251, Page 844, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; PROPOSED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • DISPOSED BY JUDGE (SRS DISPO)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO DISMISS; ACTION/DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS AND RETURN THE ORIGINAL NOTE/MORTGAGE/AND ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
191 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2009
  • NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Comment: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS OR16793PG0952-002; VER: F; P; Vol./Book 16793, Page 0952, 002 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2009
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Comment: CIVIL COVER SHEET; VER: F; P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2009
  • COMPLAINT; Comment: COMPLAINT; VER: F; P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2009
  • THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION; Comment: THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION 015 BY 3777 - RANDOM MF; VER: N; P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2009
  • CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION; Total Financial Assessment; 151.00; Total Payments and Credits; 151.00; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2014-36386; BLUE STREAK DOCS; (14.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION; Total Financial Assessment; 151.00; Total Payments and Credits; 151.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 14.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2012
  • PLAINTIFF; US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION; Total Financial Assessment; 151.00; Total Payments and Credits; 151.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CVCLW-2012-20467; KEVIN FAULKNER; (137.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2012
  • PLAINTIFF; US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION; Total Financial Assessment; 151.00; Total Payments and Credits; 151.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DEFENDANT; RODGERS, MELISSA; Total Financial Assessment; 100.00; Total Payments and Credits; 100.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 100.00

    Read MoreRead Less