This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/18/2018 at 15:14:54 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION vs. BRUCE HAYES, et al

Case Summary

On 03/03/2009 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BRUCE HAYES. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ST. JOHN, SUSAN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7-CI

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ST. JOHN, SUSAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BANK OF AMERICA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE BANK OF AMERICA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE BANK OF AMERICA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR LASALLE BANK NA AS TRUSTEE FOR RESIDENTIAL ASSET MORTGAGE PRODUCTS INC

Defendants

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES

UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSIION 2

Largo, FL 33778

UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 1

Largo, FL 33778

AMERICAN HOME MORTGAGE SERVICING INC

CLERK OF THE CIRCUIT COURT OF PINELLAS COUNTY

FLORIDA STATE OF DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

HAYES, BRUCE

Largo, FL 33778

OPTION ONE MORTGAGE CORPORATION

URTECHO, MARIA L

Largo, FL 33778

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STEPHANIE L DAVIS

Attorney at SHAPIRO FISHMAN GACHE LLP

4630 Woodland Corp Blvd Ste 100

Tampa, FL 33614

MELISSA MUROS

Attorney at ROBERTSON ANSCHUTZ SCHNEID

6409 Congress Ave Ste 100

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant Attorney

BRUCE R INSANA

Attorney at ANDREU PALMA LAVIN

1000 Nw 57Th Ct Ste 400

Miami, FL 33126

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT

04/01/2015: EXHIBIT

NOTICE OF SALE

03/25/2015: NOTICE OF SALE

COPY

10/21/2014: COPY

NOTICE OF HEARING

10/14/2014: NOTICE OF HEARING

EXHIBIT

10/13/2014: EXHIBIT

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE

10/13/2014: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE

NOTICE OF SALE

10/03/2014: NOTICE OF SALE

WITNESS LIST

02/24/2014: WITNESS LIST

NOTICE CAUSE IS AT ISSUE READY FOR TRIAL

01/27/2014: NOTICE CAUSE IS AT ISSUE READY FOR TRIAL

NOTICE OF DROPPING

01/13/2014: NOTICE OF DROPPING

AFFIDAVIT

01/13/2014: AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT

01/13/2014: AFFIDAVIT

PLTF PET'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

01/13/2014: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

12/24/2013: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

DEF RESP'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW

10/04/2013: DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW

DEF RESP'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW

06/24/2013: DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW

PLTF PET'S MOTION SUBSTITUTING PARTY

05/24/2013: PLTF-PET'S MOTION SUBSTITUTING PARTY

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE

04/01/2015: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2015
  • RETURNED ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS; NOTE AND MORTAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • CANCELED; JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE; (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL); ORDER FROM COURT; REC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • ORDER; CANCEL SALE/VACATE JUDGMENT/DISM ACTION W/O PREJ/ DISSOLVE LIS PENDENS/RELEASE ORIG LOAN DOCUMENTS; Vol./Book 18749, Page 1284, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • CASE REOPENED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE; VACATE JDMT/DISMISS ACTION/DISOLVE LIS PENDENS / RELEASE ORINGALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • EXHIBIT; A COPY OF FINAL JDMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • NOTICE OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • CANCELED; JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE; (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL); ORDER FROM COURT; REC VER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • ORDER CANCELLING FORECLOSURE SALE; AND

    Read MoreRead Less
145 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2009
  • SUMMONS TO PROCESS SERVER; Comment: SUMMONS TO PROCESS SERVER; VER: N; K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2009
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Comment: CIVIL COVER SHEET; VER: F; P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2009
  • NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Comment: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS OR16515PG1451-002; VER: F; P; Vol./Book 16515, Page 1451, 002 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2009
  • COMPLAINT AND COPY(S); Comment: COMPLAINT AND COPY(S); VER: F; P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2009
  • THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION; Comment: THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION 020 BY 6574 - RANDOM MF; VER: N; P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2009
  • CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION; Total Financial Assessment; 50.00; Total Payments and Credits; 50.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2014-55315; LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION; (50.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION; Total Financial Assessment; 50.00; Total Payments and Credits; 50.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • PLAINTIFF; LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION; Total Financial Assessment; 50.00; Total Payments and Credits; 50.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-11977; LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION; (50.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • PLAINTIFF; LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION; Total Financial Assessment; 50.00; Total Payments and Credits; 50.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less