This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/18/2018 at 10:19:49 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, et al vs. MATTHEW W BARNICLE, et al

Case Summary

On 02/06/2009 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MATTHEW W BARNICLE. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ST. ARNOLD, JACK R. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8-CI

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ST. ARNOLD, JACK R

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CREDIT SUISSE FIRST BOSTON

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR ADJUSTABLE RATE MORTGAGE TRUST 200

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR ADJUSTABLE RATE MORTGAGE TRUST 2005-2 ETC

Defendants

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING

DOE, JANE

Indian Shores, FL 33785

DOE, JOHN

Indian Shores, FL 33785

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MATTHEW BARNICLE

Indian Shores, FL 33785

BARNICLE, MATTHEW W

Indian Shores, FL 33785

CHASE BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FORMERLY KNOWN AS CHASE MANHATTAN BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATIO

PIPERS RUN CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

CHASE BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FORMERLY KNOWN AS CHASE MANHATTAN BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

EDWARD B PRITCHARD

Attorney at KASS SHULER P A

1505 N Florida Ave

Tampa, FL 33602

KIMBERLY J GUSTAFSON

Attorney at CARLTON FIELDS

3239

Tampa, FL 33601-3239

Defendant Attorney

JOSEPH S SILVER

Attorney at SILVER AND AGACINSKI PA

1325 W Cass St

Tampa, FL 33606

 

Court Documents

NOTICE

09/03/2014: NOTICE

SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AS TO

04/09/2014: SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AS TO

OBJECTION

04/09/2014: OBJECTION

ATTACHMENT

03/21/2014: ATTACHMENT

NOTICE OF HEARING

01/24/2014: NOTICE OF HEARING

ATTACHMENT

01/14/2014: ATTACHMENT

PLTF PET'S MOTION

01/14/2014: PLTF-PET'S MOTION

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

11/27/2013: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE W FORECLOSURE PROCEDURES

09/17/2013: CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH FORECLOSURE PROCEDURES

NOTICE OF FILING

09/17/2013: NOTICE OF FILING

EXHIBIT

09/16/2013: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

09/16/2013: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

09/16/2013: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

09/16/2013: EXHIBIT

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

09/16/2013: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

NOTICE OF HEARING

09/04/2013: NOTICE OF HEARING

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

07/10/2013: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

NOTICE OF FILING

07/10/2013: NOTICE OF FILING

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2016
  • RETURNED ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; PROPOSED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • AGREED ORDER; VACATING FINAL JUDGMENT/ALLOWING WITHDRAWL OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS FROM COURT FILE /DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Vol./Book 19046, Page 1975, 3 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • CASE REOPENED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • STIPULATION; MOTN TO VACATE FINAL JDTM/WITHDRAW ORIGNALS / DISMISS CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • NOTICE; FIRM NAME/ADDRESS/E-MAIL DESIGNATIONS CHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • ORDER; ON OBJECTION TO SALE (SALE IS VACATED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; 060514 2:00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • CASE REOPENED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • PLTF-PET'S MOTION; TO VACATE FORECLOSURE SALE W/ATTACHED PROPOSED/UNSIGNED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
125 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2013
  • PLAINTIFF; US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION; Total Financial Assessment; 1,938.70; Total Payments and Credits; 1,938.70; Balance Due 0.00; REALAUCTION PAYMENT; Receipt # RA-2013-11491; Wanda Jones; (70.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2013
  • PLAINTIFF; US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION; Total Financial Assessment; 1,938.70; Total Payments and Credits; 1,938.70; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 70.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2013
  • CLOSED PLAINTIFF - SUBSTITUTED; CREDIT SUISSE FIRST BOSTON; Total Financial Assessment; 24.04; Total Payments and Credits; 24.04; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2013-89158; KASS SHULER PA; (1.04)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2013
  • CLOSED PLAINTIFF - SUBSTITUTED; CREDIT SUISSE FIRST BOSTON; Total Financial Assessment; 24.04; Total Payments and Credits; 24.04; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 1.04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • CLOSED PLAINTIFF - SUBSTITUTED; CREDIT SUISSE FIRST BOSTON; Total Financial Assessment; 24.04; Total Payments and Credits; 24.04; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2013-74933; GROVE LAW OFFICE, PA; (10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • CLOSED PLAINTIFF - SUBSTITUTED; CREDIT SUISSE FIRST BOSTON; Total Financial Assessment; 24.04; Total Payments and Credits; 24.04; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2013
  • CLOSED PLAINTIFF - SUBSTITUTED; CREDIT SUISSE FIRST BOSTON; Total Financial Assessment; 24.04; Total Payments and Credits; 24.04; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2013-70269; CARLTON FIELDS; (1.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2013
  • CLOSED PLAINTIFF - SUBSTITUTED; CREDIT SUISSE FIRST BOSTON; Total Financial Assessment; 24.04; Total Payments and Credits; 24.04; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2013
  • CLOSED PLAINTIFF - SUBSTITUTED; CREDIT SUISSE FIRST BOSTON; Total Financial Assessment; 24.04; Total Payments and Credits; 24.04; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2013-70265; CARLTON FIELDS; (12.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2013
  • CLOSED PLAINTIFF - SUBSTITUTED; CREDIT SUISSE FIRST BOSTON; Total Financial Assessment; 24.04; Total Payments and Credits; 24.04; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 12.00

    Read MoreRead Less