Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/19/2018 at 22:49:24 (UTC).

US BANK N A vs. ANISSA SWINNEY, et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2009 US BANK N A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ANISSA SWINNEY. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ST. JOHN, SUSAN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2-CI

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ST. JOHN, SUSAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK N A

Defendants

ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ANISSA SWINNEY

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

PINELLAS COUNTY

Clearwater, FL 33756

ST PETERSBURG CITY OF FLORIDA

St Petersburg, FL 33701

SWINNEY, ANISSA

St Petersburg, FL 33710-2443

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RADOYKA MINAYA

Attorney at MARINOSCI LAW GROUP P C

100 W Cypress Creek Rd Ste 1045

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33309

DOUGLAS CLARK ZAHM

Attorney at EXL LEGAL PLLC

12425 28Th St N Ste 200

St Petersburg, FL 33716

Defendant Attorneys

RICHARD B BADGLEY

Attorney at SENIOR ASSISTANT CITY ATTORNEY

2842

St Petersburg, FL 33731-2842

D LYNN GORDON

Attorney at ST PETERSBURG CITY ATTY OFFICE

2842

St Petersburg, FL 33731

DOUGLAS WILCOCK

8668 Park Blvd Suite F

Seminole, FL 33777

DOUGLAS WILCOCK, ESQ

13575 58Th St N Ste 288

Clearwater, FL 33760-3740

 

Court Documents

DISMISSAL NOTICE

08/16/2013: DISMISSAL NOTICE

DISMISSAL NOTICE

08/16/2013: DISMISSAL NOTICE

DEF RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS

09/02/2014: DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS

PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE

07/23/2014: PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE

STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

07/02/2014: STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

05/15/2014: NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

NOTICE OF SALE

04/16/2014: NOTICE OF SALE

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE

04/15/2014: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

12/10/2013: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

FORECLOSURE CASE STATUS FORM

12/03/2013: FORECLOSURE CASE STATUS FORM

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

12/02/2013: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

NOTICE OF FILING

11/25/2013: NOTICE OF FILING

(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

10/25/2013: (NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

10/25/2013: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

RESPONSE

09/06/2013: RESPONSE

CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE W FORECLOSURE PROCEDURES

08/29/2013: CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH FORECLOSURE PROCEDURES

NOTICE OF FILING

08/29/2013: NOTICE OF FILING

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

10/20/2014: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2016
  • NOTICE OF FORFEITURE OF UNCLAIMED MONEY UNDER F.S.116.21; 2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; PROPOSED ORDER RCVD BY COURT 090814

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL; OF CROSSCLAIM W/PREJ; Vol./Book 18564, Page 1244, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS; (JOINT) AND STIPULATION AS TO CROSSCLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2014
  • CERTIFICATE OF TITLE; Vol./Book 18502, Page 579, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2014
  • CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE; (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL); REC VER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • DEF-RESP'S EMERGENCY MOTION; TO STOP FORECLOSURE SALE (DO NOT CANCEL PER JUDGE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • CERTIFICATE OF SALE; US BANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
102 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; US BANK N A; Total Financial Assessment; 550.50; Total Payments and Credits; 550.50; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 49.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; US BANK N A; Total Financial Assessment; 550.50; Total Payments and Credits; 550.50; Balance Due 0.00; REALAUCTION PAYMENT; Receipt # RA-2014-07301; MARIA KOMHLAN; (70.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; US BANK N A; Total Financial Assessment; 550.50; Total Payments and Credits; 550.50; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 70.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; US BANK N A; Total Financial Assessment; 550.50; Total Payments and Credits; 550.50; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2014-23339; US BANK N A; (50.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; US BANK N A; Total Financial Assessment; 550.50; Total Payments and Credits; 550.50; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • DEFENDANT; SWINNEY, ANISSA; Total Financial Assessment; 150.90; Total Payments and Credits; 150.90; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • DEFENDANT; SWINNEY, ANISSA; Total Financial Assessment; 150.90; Total Payments and Credits; 150.90; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2014-44485; SWINNEY, ANISSA; (50.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • DEFENDANT; SWINNEY, ANISSA; Total Financial Assessment; 150.90; Total Payments and Credits; 150.90; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • DEFENDANT; SWINNEY, ANISSA; Total Financial Assessment; 150.90; Total Payments and Credits; 150.90; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2014-44478; SWINNEY, ANISSA; (0.90)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • DEFENDANT; SWINNEY, ANISSA; Total Financial Assessment; 150.90; Total Payments and Credits; 150.90; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 0.90

    Read MoreRead Less