This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/18/2018 at 18:00:23 (UTC).

SUN TRUST MORTGAGE vs. ROBERT LUKE SPRAGUE, et al

Case Summary

On 03/18/2009 SUN TRUST MORTGAGE filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ROBERT LUKE SPRAGUE. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ST. JOHN, SUSAN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1-CI

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ST. JOHN, SUSAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUN TRUST MORTGAGE

Defendants

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES

DOE, JANE

Clearwater, FL 33762

DOE, JOHN

Clearwater, FL 33762

AMSOUTH BANK

AUDUBON CONDOMINIUM AT FEATHER SOUND CONDOMINIUM

1010 N Avenue

Tampa, FL 33602

REGIONS BANK

1900 Fifth Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

SPRAGUE, ROBERT LUKE

Clearwater, FL 33762

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROBERT LUKE SPRAGUE

Clearwater, FL 33762

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MONICA L BORNE

Attorney at FLORIDA FORECLOSURE ATTORNEYS PLLC

4855 Technology Way Ste 500

Boca Raton, FL 33431

WILLIAM C SLABAUGH

Attorney at FLORIDA FORECLOSURE ATTORNEYS

4855 Technology Way Ste 500

Boca Raton, FL 33431-3351

Defendant Attorneys

BRUCE M RODGERS

Attorney at BUSINESS LAW GROUP PA

301 W Platt St Ste 375

Tampa, FL 33606

LESLIE S WHITE

Attorney at DEAN MEAD et al PA

Po Box 2346

Orlando, FL 32802

RICHARD T AVIS

535 Central Ave Ste 301

St Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

11/12/2014: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

NOTICE OF HEARING

10/21/2014: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

06/18/2014: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF HEARING

05/30/2014: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE

04/18/2014: NOTICE

RESPONSE

04/10/2014: RESPONSE

EXHIBIT

04/04/2014: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

04/04/2014: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

04/04/2014: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

04/04/2014: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

04/04/2014: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

04/04/2014: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

04/04/2014: EXHIBIT

PLTF PET'S MOTION

04/04/2014: PLTF-PET'S MOTION

NOTICE OF SALE

04/29/2013: NOTICE OF SALE

CLERK CORRESPONDENCE

01/14/2013: LETTER FROM CLERK RE NO DEFAULT ENTERED

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

11/13/2014: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2014
  • ORDER; ENTERED 112414 TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE IS HEREBY DISCHARGED; Vol./Book 18615, Page 1317, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; 120114 11:00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • NOTICE OF CANCELLATION; OF HEARING 112114 11:30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL; MOTN TO LIMIT LIABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2014
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; 112114 11:30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • NOTICE OF CANCELLATION; OF HEARING 062414 2:00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; 062414 2:00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • NOTICE; FIRM ATTORNEY/DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • RESPONSE; TO MOTN TO LIMIT IABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • CASE REOPENED

    Read MoreRead Less
88 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; SUN TRUST MORTGAGE; Total Financial Assessment; 178.70; Total Payments and Credits; 178.70; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2014-20381; SUN TRUST MORTGAGE; (50.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; SUN TRUST MORTGAGE; Total Financial Assessment; 178.70; Total Payments and Credits; 178.70; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • PLAINTIFF; SUN TRUST MORTGAGE; Total Financial Assessment; 178.70; Total Payments and Credits; 178.70; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # CVCLW-2013-47475; FLORIDA FORECLOSURE ATTORNEYS PLLC; (0.70)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • PLAINTIFF; SUN TRUST MORTGAGE; Total Financial Assessment; 178.70; Total Payments and Credits; 178.70; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 0.70

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • PLAINTIFF; SUN TRUST MORTGAGE; Total Financial Assessment; 178.70; Total Payments and Credits; 178.70; Balance Due 0.00; PAYMENTTHROUGH INTEGRATION; Receipt # REA-2013-04789; Curtis Harrison; (49.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • PLAINTIFF; SUN TRUST MORTGAGE; Total Financial Assessment; 178.70; Total Payments and Credits; 178.70; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 49.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2013
  • PLAINTIFF; SUN TRUST MORTGAGE; Total Financial Assessment; 178.70; Total Payments and Credits; 178.70; Balance Due 0.00; PAYMENTTHROUGH INTEGRATION; Receipt # REA-2013-04715; Curtis Harrison; (70.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2013
  • PLAINTIFF; SUN TRUST MORTGAGE; Total Financial Assessment; 178.70; Total Payments and Credits; 178.70; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 70.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2013
  • PLAINTIFF; SUN TRUST MORTGAGE; Total Financial Assessment; 178.70; Total Payments and Credits; 178.70; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CVCLW-2013-03355; DOUG KING; (9.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2013
  • PLAINTIFF; SUN TRUST MORTGAGE; Total Financial Assessment; 178.70; Total Payments and Credits; 178.70; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 9.00

    Read MoreRead Less