This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/18/2018 at 06:46:49 (UTC).

PENNYMAC CORP Vs. TAMMARA RUBINO

Case Summary

On 01/22/2009 PENNYMAC CORP filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against TAMMARA RUBINO. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ST. JOHN, SUSAN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8-CI

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ST. JOHN, SUSAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Assignees

WACHOVIA MORTGAGE CORPORATION

PENNYMAC CORP

6101 Condor Drive Ste 200

Moorpark, CA 93021

Defendants

ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES

UNKNOWN, TENANT 1

Clearwater, FL 33756

UNKNOWN, TENANT 2

Clearwater, FL 33756

RUBINO, MICHAEL

Clearwater, FL 33756

RUBINO, TAMMARA ALSO KNOWN AS RUBINO, TAMMARA K

Clearwater, FL 33756

WACHOVIA BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

301 South College Street

Charlotte, NC 28288

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ALBERTELLI LAW GROUP

23028

Tampa, FL 33623

MEGAN L ROACH

Po Box 23028

Tampa, FL 33623

MEGAN L ROACH, ESQ

Attorney at MARONE LAW GROUP PLC

3042

St Petersburg, FL 33731-3042

Defendant Attorney

GERALD D DAVIS

Attorney at TRENAM KEMPER SCHARF

200 Central Ave Ste 1600

St Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

01/20/2015: NOTICE OF HEARING

CERTIFICATE

12/22/2014: CERTIFICATE

DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION

12/22/2014: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION

PLTF PET'S MOTION TO AMEND

12/14/2014: PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO AMEND

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT

10/21/2014: ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

10/07/2014: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

ASSIGNMENT

07/31/2014: ASSIGNMENT

NOTICE OF SALE

05/15/2014: NOTICE OF SALE

ASSIGNMENT

01/13/2014: ASSIGNMENT

NOTICE OF SALE

12/31/2013: NOTICE OF SALE

PLTF PET'S MOTION TO RESET RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE

12/05/2013: PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO RESET-RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE

CERTIFICATE

09/30/2013: CERTIFICATE

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

09/20/2013: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

PLTF PET'S MOTION

09/05/2013: PLTF-PET'S MOTION

NOTICE OF HEARING

09/05/2013: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF FILING

08/30/2013: NOTICE OF FILING

NOTICE OF SALE

07/16/2013: NOTICE OF SALE

NOTICE OF HEARING

01/22/2015: NOTICE OF HEARING

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2015
  • CERTIFICATE OF TITLE; (AMENDED); Vol./Book 18705, Page 1308, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • ORDER; AMENDING CERTIFICATE OF TITLE; Vol./Book 18704, Page 1505, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; 022515 2:00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; 030315 2:00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2014
  • CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; REQUEST TO STAY FROM TENANT PRO SE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • CASE REOPENED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION; FILED BY PURCHASER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • CERTIFICATE; OF NO TENANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • CASE REOPENED

    Read MoreRead Less
135 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; PENNYMAC CORP; Total Financial Assessment; 1,191.70; Total Payments and Credits; 1,191.70; Balance Due 0.00; REALAUCTION PAYMENT; Receipt # RA-2014-07592; Brandee Williams; (945.70)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; PENNYMAC CORP; Total Financial Assessment; 1,191.70; Total Payments and Credits; 1,191.70; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 945.70

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; PENNYMAC CORP; Total Financial Assessment; 1,191.70; Total Payments and Credits; 1,191.70; Balance Due 0.00; REALAUCTION PAYMENT; Receipt # RA-2014-07589; Brandee Williams; (49.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; PENNYMAC CORP; Total Financial Assessment; 1,191.70; Total Payments and Credits; 1,191.70; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 49.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; PENNYMAC CORP; Total Financial Assessment; 1,191.70; Total Payments and Credits; 1,191.70; Balance Due 0.00; REALAUCTION PAYMENT; Receipt # RA-2014-07344; Brandee Williams; (70.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; PENNYMAC CORP; Total Financial Assessment; 1,191.70; Total Payments and Credits; 1,191.70; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 70.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2013
  • CLOSED PLAINTIFF - SUBSTITUTED; WACHOVIA MORTGAGE CORPORATION; Total Financial Assessment; 100.00; Total Payments and Credits; 100.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2013-92371; WACHOVIA MORTGAGE CORPORATION; (50.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2013
  • CLOSED PLAINTIFF - SUBSTITUTED; WACHOVIA MORTGAGE CORPORATION; Total Financial Assessment; 100.00; Total Payments and Credits; 100.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2013
  • CLOSED PLAINTIFF - SUBSTITUTED; WACHOVIA MORTGAGE CORPORATION; Total Financial Assessment; 100.00; Total Payments and Credits; 100.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2013-73433; WACHOVIA MORTGAGE CORPORATION; (50.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2013
  • CLOSED PLAINTIFF - SUBSTITUTED; WACHOVIA MORTGAGE CORPORATION; Total Financial Assessment; 100.00; Total Payments and Credits; 100.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less