This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/18/2018 at 05:05:36 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC Vs. WILLIAM EATON, et al

Case Summary

On 01/12/2009 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against WILLIAM EATON. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ST. JOHN, SUSAN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4-CI

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ST. JOHN, SUSAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

Defendants

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES

DOE, JANE

Clearwater, FL 33762

DOE, JOHN

Clearwater, FL 33762

EATON, MARY BETH ALSO KNOWN AS EATON, MARYBETH

Clearwater, FL 33762

EATON, WILLIAM

Clearwater, FL 33762

FEATHER SOUND CUSTOM HOME SITE UNIT III HOMEOWNERS

13577 Feather Sound Drive Suite 300

Clearwater, FL 33762

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MARIA KWAK

Attorney at BROCK AND SCOTT PLLC

25018

Tampa, FL 33622-5018

ELIZABETH E NIXON

7530 Little Rd

New Port Richey, FL 34654

Defendant Attorneys

GRAYDEN M DOUGH

Attorney at GRAYDEN M DOUGH PA

Po Box 1351

Port Richey, FL 34673

ADAM J KNIGHT

400 North Ashley Drive Suite 1500

Tampa, FL 33602

ADAM J KNIGHT, ESQ

Attorney at BURR AND FORMAN LLP

201 N Franklin St Ste 3200

Tampa, FL 33602

DENIS A COHRS

Attorney at COHRS LAW GROUP P A

2841 Executive Dr Ste 120

Clearwater, FL 33762

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

04/16/2015: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

PLTF PET'S MOTION TO DISMISS

04/16/2015: PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/30/2014: NOTICE OF HEARING

DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE

11/03/2014: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE

NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE

10/28/2014: NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE

NOTICE OF SALE

09/09/2014: NOTICE OF SALE

WITNESS LIST

07/07/2014: WITNESS LIST

EXHIBIT

04/11/2014: EXHIBIT

AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES

04/11/2014: AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES

ANSWER AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

02/19/2014: ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

NOTICE OF HEARING

01/01/2014: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

12/19/2013: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

EXHIBIT

08/28/2013: EXHIBIT

DEF RESP'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

08/28/2013: DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF FILING

06/17/2013: NOTICE OF FILING

EXHIBIT

04/26/2013: EXHIBIT

NOTICE OF FILING

04/08/2013: NOTICE OF FILING

AMENDED

04/08/2013: AMENDED

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2015
  • CERTIFICATE; OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • ATTACHMENT; COPY ORDER DISMISSING CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • CANCELED; JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE; (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL); ORDER FROM COURT; REC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • RETURNED ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS; ORIGINAL NOTE ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • ORDER; DISMISSING CASE/CANCELLING SALE/CANCELLING NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS/SETTING ASIDE JUDGMENT/RETURN ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS; Vol./Book 18782, Page 473, 3 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; 050615 2:00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • CASE REOPENED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO DISMISS; CASE/CANCEL SALE/LIS PENDENS/ SET ASIDE JDMT/RETURN ORIGINALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • ATTACHMENT; COPY OF NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • ATTACHMENT; COPY OF MORTGAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
171 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2015
  • PLAINTIFF; NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 252.00; Total Payments and Credits; 252.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-11832; NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC; (50.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • PLAINTIFF; NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 252.00; Total Payments and Credits; 252.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • PLAINTIFF; NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 252.00; Total Payments and Credits; 252.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-06380; NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC; (50.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • PLAINTIFF; NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 252.00; Total Payments and Credits; 252.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 252.00; Total Payments and Credits; 252.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2014-58336; NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC; (50.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 252.00; Total Payments and Credits; 252.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • PLAINTIFF; NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 252.00; Total Payments and Credits; 252.00; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # CVCLW-2013-29828; PROVEST; (1.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • PLAINTIFF; NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 252.00; Total Payments and Credits; 252.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • PLAINTIFF; NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 252.00; Total Payments and Credits; 252.00; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # CVCLW-2013-29826; PROVEST; (1.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • PLAINTIFF; NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 252.00; Total Payments and Credits; 252.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 1.00

    Read MoreRead Less