This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/18/2018 at 20:44:51 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC vs. VICTOR CARRANZA, et al

Case Summary

On 04/02/2009 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against VICTOR CARRANZA. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOYER, BRUCE. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0-CI

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOYER, BRUCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

Defendants

WALLACE, LEVI

Clearwater, FL 33755

JANE DOE 1

Clearwater, FL 33755

JANE DOE 2

Clearwater, FL 33755

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF VICTOR M CARRANZA

Dunedin, FL 34698

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES

CARRANZA, VICTOR M ALSO KNOWN AS CARRANZA, VICTOR

Dunedin, FL 34698

JOHN DOE 2

Clearwater, FL 33755

CARRANZA, VICTOR ALSO KNOWN AS CARRANZA, VICTOR M ALSO KNOWN AS CARRANZA, VICTOR MERCEDES

Dunedin, FL 34698

WALLACE, LEVI FORMERLY KNOWN AS JOHN DOE 1

Clearwater, FL 33755

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JONATHAN MEISELS

Attorney at ROBERTSON ANSCHUTZ SCHNEID

6409 Congress Ave 100

Boca Raton, FL 33487

CASSANDRA RACINE RIGAUD

Attorney at MILLENNIUM PARTNERS

21500 Biscayne Blvd Ste 600

Aventura, FL 33180

CASSANDRA M RIGAUD

21500 Biscayne Blvd Ste 600

Aventura, FL 33180

JACQUELINE POWELL

Attorney at ROBERTSON ANSCHUTZ SCHNEID

6409 Congress Ave Ste 100

Boca Raton, FL 33487

 

Court Documents

DISMISSAL NOTICE

12/06/2013: DISMISSAL NOTICE

DISMISSAL NOTICE

12/06/2013: DISMISSAL NOTICE

DISMISSAL NOTICE

12/06/2013: DISMISSAL NOTICE

DISMISSAL NOTICE

12/06/2013: DISMISSAL NOTICE

DISMISSAL NOTICE

12/06/2013: DISMISSAL NOTICE

NOTICE OF SALE

02/12/2016: NOTICE OF SALE

CERTIFICATE

02/02/2016: CERTIFICATE

CERTIFICATE

12/01/2015: CERTIFICATE

ATTACHMENT

10/22/2015: ATTACHMENT

EXHIBIT

10/22/2015: EXHIBIT

PLTF PET'S MOTION

10/22/2015: PLTF-PET'S MOTION

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

10/16/2015: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

NOTICE OF FILING

11/17/2014: NOTICE OF FILING

PLTF PET'S MOTION SUBSTITUTING PARTY

05/07/2014: PLTF-PET'S MOTION SUBSTITUTING PARTY

PLTF PET'S MOTION

12/17/2013: PLTF-PET'S MOTION

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

12/03/2013: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO-COUNSEL

12/03/2013: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO-COUNSEL

CLERK CORRESPONDENCE

03/30/2016: CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2016
  • CERTIFICATE OF TITLE; Vol./Book 19135, Page 1469, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE; (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL); REC VER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • CERTIFICATE OF SALE; NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2016
  • NOTICE OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • NOTICE; OF CHANGE OF FIRM ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • CERTIFICATE; OF SERVICE OF UNIFORM FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
86 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2016
  • PLAINTIFF; NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 414.40; Total Payments and Credits; 414.40; Balance Due 0.00; REALAUCTION PAYMENT; Receipt # RA-2016-01813; DAVID SCHNEID; (49.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • PLAINTIFF; NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 414.40; Total Payments and Credits; 414.40; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 49.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • PLAINTIFF; NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 414.40; Total Payments and Credits; 414.40; Balance Due 0.00; REALAUCTION PAYMENT; Receipt # RA-2016-01783; DAVID SCHNEID; (70.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • PLAINTIFF; NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 414.40; Total Payments and Credits; 414.40; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 70.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • CLOSED PLAINTIFF - DROPPED/DISMISSED; AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 28.00; Total Payments and Credits; 28.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # SW-2015-01063; A BETTER PROCESS; (3.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • CLOSED PLAINTIFF - DROPPED/DISMISSED; AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 28.00; Total Payments and Credits; 28.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • CLOSED PLAINTIFF - DROPPED/DISMISSED; AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 28.00; Total Payments and Credits; 28.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # SW-2015-00459; MORTEN CHRISTOFFERSEN; (10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • CLOSED PLAINTIFF - DROPPED/DISMISSED; AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 28.00; Total Payments and Credits; 28.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2014
  • CLOSED PLAINTIFF - DROPPED/DISMISSED; AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 28.00; Total Payments and Credits; 28.00; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2014-43380; ProVest LLC; (15.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2014
  • CLOSED PLAINTIFF - DROPPED/DISMISSED; AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 28.00; Total Payments and Credits; 28.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 15.00

    Read MoreRead Less