Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/19/2018 at 19:02:00 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC vs. ROLANDO A ESCAMILLA, et al

Case Summary

On 07/30/2009 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ROLANDO A ESCAMILLA. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAY, JACK. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3-CI

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAY, JACK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

2727 West Cypress Creek Road

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

Defendants

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES

BANK OF AMERICA N A

1425 N W 62Nd St

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33309

ESCAMILLA, MEGAN

St Petersburg, FL 33703

ESCAMILLA, ROLANDO A

St Petersburg, FL 33703

MARGHEIM, MARILYN

St Petersburg, FL 33703

MARGHEIM, MARTIN

St Petersburg, FL 33703

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Tampa, FL 33602

Assignee

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION

C/O Nationstar Mortgage Llc 8950 Cyrpess Waters Blvd

Coppell, TX 75019

Not Classified By Court

ESCAMILLA, ROLANDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STEVE A REGAL

Attorney at ELIZABETH R WELLBORN P A

350 Jim Moran Blvd Suite 100

Deefield Beach, FL 33442

AMELIA A BERSON

Attorney at CHOICE LEGAL GROUP

9908

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33310-0908

OMAR SALEH

Attorney at SYNERGY LAW FIRM

5455 Sw 8Th St Ste 255

Miami, FL 33134

VIVIEN LURLENE

Attorney at ROBERTSON ANSCHUTZ SCHNEID P L

6409 Congress Ave Ste 100

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant Attorneys

ANTHONY COMPARETTO

24Th Floor

St Petersburg, FL 33701

ANTHONY J COMPARETTO, ESQ

Attorney at COMPARETTO LAW FIRM

1298

St Petersburg, FL 33731-1298

SHAWN M YESNER

Attorney at YESNER LAW P L

2753 Sr 580 Ste 202

Clearwater, FL 33761

JOHN F RUDY, III

Attorney at ASSISTANT US ATTY

400 N Tampa St Ste 3200

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

NOTICE

09/09/2015: NOTICE

NOTICE OF SALE

07/21/2015: NOTICE OF SALE

CERTIFICATE

06/09/2015: CERTIFICATE

AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

05/04/2015: AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

NOTICE OF FILING

05/04/2015: NOTICE OF FILING

NOTICE OF FILING

03/10/2015: NOTICE OF FILING

MOTION

02/24/2015: MOTION

NOTICE

01/09/2015: NOTICE

CERTIFICATE

11/11/2014: CERTIFICATE

STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

10/14/2014: STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/09/2014: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

PLTF PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT

10/03/2014: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT

PLTF PET'S MOTION

10/01/2014: PLTF-PET'S MOTION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO-COUNSEL

10/01/2014: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO-COUNSEL

NOTICE OF HEARING

04/03/2014: NOTICE OF HEARING

ATTACHMENT

02/21/2014: ATTACHMENT

ATTACHMENT

02/21/2014: ATTACHMENT

NOTICE OF FILING

02/21/2014: NOTICE OF FILING

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2015
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION; RETURNED UNEXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION; ISSUED TO ATTY 9/28/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; PROPOSED ORDER RCVD BY COURT 091515

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • CASE REOPENED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • AFFIDAVIT; A - AFFD OF OCCUPANCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • NOTICE; OF LEAD COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • COPY CERT OF TITLE & CERT OF NO DISBURSEMENT RETD BY PO; Party: MARGHEIM, MARILYN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • RETURNED FROM POST OFFICE; COPY CERTIFICATE OF TITLE/COPY CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
143 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2015
  • PLAINTIFF; NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 282.50; Total Payments and Credits; 282.50; Balance Due 0.00; REALAUCTION PAYMENT; Receipt # RA-2015-06626; DAVID SCHNEID; (49.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • PLAINTIFF; NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 282.50; Total Payments and Credits; 282.50; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 49.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • PLAINTIFF; NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 282.50; Total Payments and Credits; 282.50; Balance Due 0.00; REALAUCTION PAYMENT; Receipt # RA-2015-06587; DAVID SCHNEID; (70.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • PLAINTIFF; NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 282.50; Total Payments and Credits; 282.50; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 70.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 282.50; Total Payments and Credits; 282.50; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # SW-2014-00646; YESNER, SHAWN M; (7.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 282.50; Total Payments and Credits; 282.50; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2012
  • PLAINTIFF; NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 282.50; Total Payments and Credits; 282.50; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # CVCLW-2012-29359; DALY PROCESS SERVER; (19.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2012
  • PLAINTIFF; NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 282.50; Total Payments and Credits; 282.50; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 19.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • PLAINTIFF; NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 282.50; Total Payments and Credits; 282.50; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # CVCLW-2012-28422; DPS GROUP; (19.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • PLAINTIFF; NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 282.50; Total Payments and Credits; 282.50; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 19.00

    Read MoreRead Less