This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/18/2018 at 07:39:11 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORGAGE LLC vs. BRIANNE MCCORMICK, et al

Case Summary

On 01/27/2009 NATIONSTAR MORGAGE LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BRIANNE MCCORMICK. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ST. JOHN, SUSAN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8-CI

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ST. JOHN, SUSAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

Defendants

FLORIDA STATE OFDEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

H ELLSWORTH MILLER REVOCABLE TRUST

MCCORMICK, BRIANNE ALSO KNOWN AS MCCORMICK, BRIANNE M

Clearwater, FL 33759

UNKNOWN TENANT S

Seminole, FL 33772

WAGSTAFF, JOHN

Seminole, FL 33772

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JESSICA BRIDGES

Attorney at CHOICE LEGAL GROUP P A

1800 Nw 49 St Suite 120

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33309

TARA CASTILLO

Attorney at ALDRIDGE PITE LLP

1615 S Congress Ave Ste 200

Delray Beach, FL 33445

SUSAN W FINDLEY

Attorney at ALDRIDGE PITE LLP

1615 S Congress Ave Ste 200

Delray Beach, FL 33445

JULIA Y POLETTI

Attorney at ALDRIDGE PITE LLP

1615 S Congress Ave Ste 200

Delray Beach, FL 33445

HOLLIS HAMILTON

Attorney at ALDRIDGE PITE LLP

1615 S Congress Ave Ste 200

Delray Beach, FL 33445

Defendant Attorney

MARY LOU WAGSTAFF

Attorney at WAGSTAFF LAW OFFICE P A

161 - 14Th Street Nw

Largo, FL 33770

 

Court Documents

CLERK CORRESPONDENCE

01/16/2015: COPY CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE

AFFIDAVIT

11/10/2014: AFFIDAVIT

NOTICE OF SALE

06/04/2014: NOTICE OF SALE

NOTICE

04/03/2014: NOTICE

ATTACHMENT

02/14/2014: ATTACHMENT

NOTICE OF HEARING

02/14/2014: NOTICE OF HEARING

ATTACHMENT

02/14/2014: ATTACHMENT

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/23/2013: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE

12/23/2013: NOTICE

NOTICE OF FILING

10/16/2013: NOTICE OF FILING

PLTF PET'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

10/16/2013: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

10/16/2013: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

PLTF PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT

10/15/2013: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT

ANSWER AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

08/09/2013: ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

NOTICE OF HEARING

07/08/2013: NOTICE OF HEARING

EXHIBIT

06/28/2013: EXHIBIT

PLTF PET'S MOTION SUBSTITUTING PARTY

06/28/2013: PLTF-PET'S MOTION SUBSTITUTING PARTY

WRIT OF POSSESSION

01/28/2015: WRIT OF POSSESSION

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2015
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION; EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION; ISSUED TO ATTY 1/28/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • COPY CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE; WRIT OF POSSESSION / SHF CHECK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2014
  • CASE REOPENED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2014
  • PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2014
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2014
  • CERTIFICATE; OF NO TENANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2014
  • AFFIDAVIT; OF OCCUPANCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
87 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2009
  • NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Comment: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS OR16485PG0295-001; VER: F; P; Vol./Book 16485, Page 0295, 001 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2009
  • COMPLAINT; Comment: COMPLAINT; VER: F; P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2009
  • THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION; Comment: THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION 008 BY 0932 - RANDOM MF; VER: N; P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2009
  • CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 169.00; Total Payments and Credits; 169.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2014-58953; NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC; (50.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 169.00; Total Payments and Credits; 169.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 169.00; Total Payments and Credits; 169.00; Balance Due 0.00; REALAUCTION PAYMENT; Receipt # RA-2014-05669; Marshall Watson; (49.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 169.00; Total Payments and Credits; 169.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 49.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 169.00; Total Payments and Credits; 169.00; Balance Due 0.00; REALAUCTION PAYMENT; Receipt # RA-2014-04982; Marshall Watson; (70.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 169.00; Total Payments and Credits; 169.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 70.00

    Read MoreRead Less