This case was last updated from Pinellas County Courts on 12/21/2018 at 05:50:21 (UTC).

KAREN PENLAND vs. LEONOR RISSOTTO CARVAJAL, et al

Case Summary

On 10/26/2009 KAREN PENLAND filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LEONOR RISSOTTO CARVAJAL,. This case was filed in Pinellas County Courts, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CAMPBELL, PAMELA A.M.. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9-CI

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CAMPBELL, PAMELA A.M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellee

PENLAND, KAREN

Defendants and Appellants

CARVAJAL, LEONOR RISSOTTO

St Petersburg, FL 33702

CARVAJAL, SERGIO

St Petersburg, FL 33702

STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY

STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY

200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DANIEL J LEEPER

Attorney at LEEPER AND LEEPER

2532 Fifth Ave North

St Petersburg, FL 33713

NANCY A LAUTEN, ESQ

Attorney at VAKA LAW GROUP P L

777 S Harbour Island Blvd Ste 300

Tampa, FL 33602

GEORGE A VAKA, ESQ

Attorney at VAKA LAW GROUP PL

777 S Harbour Island Blvd Ste 300

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorneys

MARK D TINKER

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER PA

360 Central Avenue Suite 700

St Petersburg, FL 33701

BRUCE D AUSTIN

Attorney at AUSTIN ROE BASQUILL PA

12066 93 Wy N

St Petersburg, FL 33773

CHARLES W HALL

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER PA

360 Central Avenue Suite 700

St Petersburg, FL 33701

J EMORY WOOD, ESQ

Attorney at WOOD AND WOOD P A

1034 16 St N Ste A

St Petersburg, FL 33705-1147

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

09/15/2013: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

EXHIBIT

09/09/2013: EXHIBIT

NOTICE OF APPEAL

05/09/2014: NOTICE OF APPEAL

INTERROGATORIES

09/08/2013: INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF

11/15/2013: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF

NOTICE OF SERVICE EXPERT INTERROGATORIES

11/15/2013: NOTICE OF SERVICE EXPERT INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR COPIES

12/20/2013: REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

09/08/2013: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

12/10/2013: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

102 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2016
  • DocketEVIDENCE DESTROYED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • DocketEVIDENCE DESTRUCTION; (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer REQUIRED, NO JUDGE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • DocketINTENT TO DESTROY EVIDENCE; LETTER MAILED TO PLTF ATTY & ATTYS FOR DEFENDANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • DocketAPPEAL CLERK'S WORKSHEET WITH ATTACHMENT; (2D14-1519)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2014
  • DocketAPPEAL CLERK'S WORKSHEET WITH ATTACHMENT; (2D14-2268)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • DocketDCA ORDER; (2D14-1519) DISMISSING APPEAL PURSUANT TO THE NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • DocketDCA ORDER; (2D14-2268) DISMISSING APPEAL PURSUANT TO THE NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; W/ATTACHED SATISFACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; W/ATTACHED COPY OF SATISFACTION OF JDMT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • DocketDCA ORDER INITIAL BRIEF DUE; 7/5/14 (2D14-1519)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
484 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2013
  • DocketDEFENDANT; CARVAJAL, LEONOR RISSOTTO; Total Financial Assessment; 1,471.93; Total Payments and Credits; 1,445.59; Balance Due 26.34; Transaction Assessment; 50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2012
  • DocketDEFENDANT; CARVAJAL, LEONOR RISSOTTO; Total Financial Assessment; 1,471.93; Total Payments and Credits; 1,445.59; Balance Due 26.34; Transaction Assessment; 26.34

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2012
  • DocketDEFENDANT; CARVAJAL, LEONOR RISSOTTO; Total Financial Assessment; 1,471.93; Total Payments and Credits; 1,445.59; Balance Due 26.34; Mail Payment; Receipt # CVCLW-2012-11042; BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER; (8.58)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2012
  • DocketDEFENDANT; CARVAJAL, LEONOR RISSOTTO; Total Financial Assessment; 1,471.93; Total Payments and Credits; 1,445.59; Balance Due 26.34; Transaction Assessment; 8.58

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • DocketDEFENDANT; CARVAJAL, LEONOR RISSOTTO; Total Financial Assessment; 1,471.93; Total Payments and Credits; 1,445.59; Balance Due 26.34; Counter Payment; Receipt # CVCLW-2012-09546; BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER PA; (8.50)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • DocketDEFENDANT; CARVAJAL, LEONOR RISSOTTO; Total Financial Assessment; 1,471.93; Total Payments and Credits; 1,445.59; Balance Due 26.34; Transaction Assessment; 8.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • DocketDEFENDANT; CARVAJAL, LEONOR RISSOTTO; Total Financial Assessment; 1,471.93; Total Payments and Credits; 1,445.59; Balance Due 26.34; Mail Payment; Receipt # CVCLW-2012-09118; STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY; (352.01)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2012
  • DocketDEFENDANT; CARVAJAL, LEONOR RISSOTTO; Total Financial Assessment; 1,471.93; Total Payments and Credits; 1,445.59; Balance Due 26.34; Transaction Assessment; 352.01

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • DocketDEFENDANT; CARVAJAL, LEONOR RISSOTTO; Total Financial Assessment; 1,471.93; Total Payments and Credits; 1,445.59; Balance Due 26.34; Mail Payment; Receipt # CVCLW-2012-00841; BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER PA; (105.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • DocketDEFENDANT; CARVAJAL, LEONOR RISSOTTO; Total Financial Assessment; 1,471.93; Total Payments and Credits; 1,445.59; Balance Due 26.34; Transaction Assessment; 105.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAUTEN , NANCY ANN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DANIEL J LEEPER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GEORGE A VAKA, ESQ