This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/21/2018 at 16:41:40 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION vs. JAMES H SELLERS Jr, et al

Case Summary

On 12/28/2009 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JAMES H SELLERS Jr. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ST. JOHN, SUSAN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5-CI

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ST. JOHN, SUSAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

TENANT 3

TENANT 4

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JAMES H SELLERS JR

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES

CITIBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS SUCCESSOR TO CITIBANK FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK

CRYSTAL BAY CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

200 North Pine Ave Suite A

Oldsmar, FL 34677

REGIONS BANK DOING BUSINESS AS AMSOUTH BANK

1901 N 6Th

Birmingham, AL 35203

RODEFFER, TAMMY FORMERLY KNOWN AS TENANT 1

Clearwater, FL 33762

SELLERS, JAMES H, JR ALSO KNOWN AS SELLERS, JAMES

Clearwater, FL 33762

STRAUSER, COLE FORMERLY KNOWN AS TENANT 2

Clearwater, FL 33762

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCOTT R LIN

Attorney at RONALD WOLFE AND ASSOCIATES

25018

Tampa, FL 33622

Defendant Attorneys

NIURKA FERNANDEZ ASMER

113 S Blvd Suite 100

Tampa, FL 33606

NIURKA FERNANDEZ ASMER, ESQ

Attorney at FL LEGAL GROUP

501 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 810

Tampa, FL 33602

JOSEPH R CIANFRONE

Attorney at CIANFRONE NIKOLOFF GRANT

1964 Bayshore Blvd Ste A

Dunedin, FL 34698

LEAH H MAYERSOHN, ESQ

Attorney at MAYERSOHN LAW GROUP P A

101 Ne 3 Ave Suite 1250

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

PLTF PET'S MOTION

08/09/2013: PLTF-PET'S MOTION

MOTION

07/11/2013: MOTION

NOTICE OF FILING

06/17/2013: NOTICE OF FILING

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

06/14/2013: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

NOTICE OF FILING

06/14/2013: NOTICE OF FILING

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

06/14/2013: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

06/14/2013: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

NOTICE OF FILING

06/14/2013: NOTICE OF FILING

NON RECORDED JOINT STIPULATION

04/16/2013: NON RECORDED JOINT STIPULATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

04/11/2013: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF HEARING

04/10/2013: NOTICE OF HEARING

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

08/09/2013: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

05/24/2013: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

05/15/2013: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

05/09/2013: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2013
  • ATTORNEY COVER LETTER; RCVD BY COURT 080913

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL; W/OUT PREJUDICE/ CANCEL NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS/RETURN ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS AND SUBSTITUTE PHOTOSTATIC COPIES; RTD 08/26/2013; Vol./Book 18126, Page 1137, 3 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2013
  • FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2013
  • PLTF-PET'S MOTION; FOR ENTRY OF ORDER DISMISSING CASE AND CANCELLING NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS AND DIRECTING CLERK TO RTN ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • ORDER; SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 091113 1:30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • MOTION; FOR CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • MEMORANDUM OF LAW; IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2013
  • NOTICE OF FILING; AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
99 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2009
  • Circuit Civil Filing - Fee Paid $; Comment: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE PAID $905.00; VER: N; P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2009
  • SUMMONS TO PROCESS SERVER - PICK UP; Comment: SUMMONS TO PROCESS SERVER - PICK UP; VER: N; K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2009
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Comment: CIVIL COVER SHEET; VER: F; P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2009
  • VALUE OF REAL PROP-MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM; Comment: VALUE OF REAL PROP/MORT FORECLOSURE CLAIM; VER: F; P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2009
  • NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Comment: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS OR16793PG1298-001; VER: F; P; Vol./Book 16793, Page 1298, 001 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2009
  • COMPLAINT AND COPY(S); Comment: COMPLAINT AND COPY(S); VER: F; P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2009
  • THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION; Comment: THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION 020 BY 6574 - RANDOM MF; VER: N; P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2009
  • CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2013
  • PLAINTIFF; JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION; Total Financial Assessment; 9.00; Total Payments and Credits; 9.00; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # CVCLW-2013-44965; RONALD R WOLFE; (9.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2013
  • PLAINTIFF; JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION; Total Financial Assessment; 9.00; Total Payments and Credits; 9.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 9.00

    Read MoreRead Less