This case was last updated from Pinellas County Courts on 12/14/2018 at 07:56:04 (UTC).

JOHNSON TOWERS CORPORATION vs. BRADLEY W HALL, et al

Case Summary

On 04/23/2010 JOHNSON TOWERS CORPORATION filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BRADLEY W HALL,. This case was filed in Pinellas County Courts, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CAMPBELL, PAMELA A.M.. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0-CI

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2010

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CAMPBELL, PAMELA A.M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

JOHNSON TOWERS CORPORATION

C/O Dan Johnson 4950 Gulf Blvd Unit No 1008

St Petersburg, FL 33706

Defendants and Appellees

GENESIS COMMUNICATIONS OF TAMPA BAY INC

HALL, BRADLEY W

ROBCO HOLDING L L C DOING BUSINESS AS ROBCO SEPTIC SOLUTIONS

1845 Santa Barbara Drive

Dunedin, FL 34698

RSC EQUIPMENT RENTAL INC

Appellees

AGELATOS, SAM

ASA BROADCASTING INC

GENESIS COMMUNICATIONS OF TAMPA BAY INC

HALL, BRADLEY W

RSC EQUIPMENT RENTAL INC

Not Classified By Court

JACKSON, JOHN R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

MARSHAL G REISSMAN

Attorney at REISSMAN LAW GROUP P A

5150 Central Ave

St Petersburg, FL 33707

Appellee and Defendant Attorneys

MICHAEL ALEXANDAR GARCIA

Attorney at FOWLER WHITE BURNETT

1395 Brickell Ave Ste 14

Miami, FL 33131

JOSEPH W ETTER, IV

Attorney at ENGLANDER FISCHER

721 First Ave North

St Petersburg, FL 33701

HAROLD A SAUL

Attorney at KUBICKI DRAPER

400 N Ashley Dr Ste 1200

Tampa, FL 33602

JAMES L WHITE

Attorney at BOBO CIOTOLI WHITE

11641 Key Gardens Ave Ste 101

Palm Bch Gardens, FL 33410

ANTHONE R DAMIANAKIS

Attorney at PEACOCK GAFFNEY DAMIANAKIS PA

2348 Sunset Point Rd

Clearwater, FL 33765

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/27/2013: NOTICE OF HEARING

DEPOSITION OF

06/04/2013: DEPOSITION OF

NOTICE OF HEARING

10/24/2013: NOTICE OF HEARING

CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

07/26/2013: CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

AFFIDAVIT

12/02/2013: AFFIDAVIT

DEF RESP'S MOTION

12/10/2013: DEF-RESP'S MOTION

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/11/2013: NOTICE OF HEARING

DEPOSITION OF

07/16/2013: DEPOSITION OF

EXHIBIT

01/27/2014: EXHIBIT

204 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2015
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; PROPOSED ORDER RCVD BY COURT 032415

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • DocketORDER APPROVING; SETTLEMENT AND STIP FOR DISMISSAL OF COUNT IX OF PLTFS AMENDED COMPLAINT AGAINST GENESIS COMMUNICATIONS OF TAMPA BAY INC N/K/A OR F/K/A STARTER ENTERPRISES INC WITH PREJUDICE; Vol./Book 18726, Page 584, 1 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • DocketSTIPULATION; FOR DISMISSAL OF COUNT IX OF PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT AGAINS GENESIS COMMUNICATIONS OF TAMPA BAY INC N/K/A OR FKAY STARTER ENTERPRISES INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • DocketORDER TO APPEAR FOR CASE MANAGEMENT AND STATUS CONFERENCE; 052115 2PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • DocketCASE REOPENED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • DocketMOTION; FOR ENFORCEMENT OF SETTLEMENT AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2014
  • DocketAPPEAL CLERK'S WORKSHEET WITH ATTACHMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • DocketDCA ORDER; DISMISSING APPEAL PURSUANT TO THE NOTICE OF THE VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED HEREIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • DocketOBJECTION; AND RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • DocketORDER TO APPEAR FOR CASE MANAGEMENT AND STATUS CONFERENCE; 022015 9:30 (AMENDED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
517 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2010
  • DocketCircuit Civil Filing - Fee Paid $; Comment: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE PAID $400.00; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2010
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTORNEY; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTORNEY; VER: N; K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2010
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Comment: CIVIL COVER SHEET; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2010
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Comment: COMPLAINT; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2010
  • DocketTHIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION; Comment: THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION 011 BY 8898 - RANDOM CI; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2010
  • DocketCASE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • DocketAPPELLANT; JOHNSON TOWERS CORPORATION; Total Financial Assessment; 1,090.00; Total Payments and Credits; 1,090.00; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2014-31945; REISSMAN, MARSHAL G; (973.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • DocketAPPELLANT; JOHNSON TOWERS CORPORATION; Total Financial Assessment; 1,090.00; Total Payments and Credits; 1,090.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 973.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • DocketAPPELLANT; JOHNSON TOWERS CORPORATION; Total Financial Assessment; 1,090.00; Total Payments and Credits; 1,090.00; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2014-06295; REISSMAN, MARSHAL G; (117.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • DocketAPPELLANT; JOHNSON TOWERS CORPORATION; Total Financial Assessment; 1,090.00; Total Payments and Credits; 1,090.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 117.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RSC EQUIPMENT RENTAL, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ETTER , JOSEPH WESLEY, IV

Latest cases represented by Lawyer White, James L

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAROLD A SAUL