This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/18/2018 at 18:51:45 (UTC).

INDYMAC FEDERAL BANK FSB vs. SUPERIOR DEVELOPMENT INVESTMENT CORP, et al

Case Summary

On 03/23/2009 INDYMAC FEDERAL BANK FSB filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SUPERIOR DEVELOPMENT INVESTMENT CORP. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHAEFER, JOHN A. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7-CI

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHAEFER, JOHN A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

INDYMAC FEDERAL BANK FSB

Defendants and Appellees

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES

NABOZNY, FRANK J

Palm Harbor, FL 34683

TENANT 1

Palm Harbor, FL 34683

TENANT 2

Palm Harbor, FL 34683

TENANT 3

TENANT 4

CIANCI, ROBERT L

Tarpon Springs, FL 34688-9019

NEW TECH PEST CONTROL COMPANY INC

1154 Skye Lane Unit 1026

Palm Harbor, FL 34683

SUPERIOR DEVELOPMENT INVESTMENT CORP

5 Citrus Drive

Palm Harbor, FL 34683

UDT 1395 ATED 1/20/05

UNKNOWN BENEFICIARIES OF THE UDT 1395 DATED

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF FRANK J NABOZNY

Palm Harbor, FL 34683

UDT 1395 ATED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

DAPHNE GANTHIER

Attorney at ROBERTSON ANSCHUTZ SCHNEID PL

6409 Congress Ave Ste 100

Boca Raton, FL 33487

PAUL SODHI, JR

Attorney at BLANK ROME LLP

500 E Broward Boulevard Suite 2100

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33394

KRISTEN S GOTTFRIED, ESQ

Attorney at ROBERTSON ANSCHUTZ SCHNEID

6409 Congress Ave Ste 100

Boca Raton, FL 33487

PAUL M MESSINA, ESQ

Attorney at BLANK ROME LLP

201 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 520

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant and Appellee Attorneys

ROBERT G KIPP

Attorney at ROBERT G KIPP P A

4245 W Kennedy Blvd

Tampa, FL 33609

GEORGE G PAPPAS

Attorney at GEORGE G PAPPAS P A

1822 N Belcher Rd Ste 200

Clearwater, FL 33765

JULIA B KITE-POWELL

Attorney at JULIA B KITE-POWELL P A

Po Box 18645

Tampa, FL 33679

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO-COUNSEL

03/23/2016: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO-COUNSEL

APPEAL CLERK'S WORKSHEET W ATTACHMENT

03/11/2016: APPEAL CLERK'S WORKSHEET WITH ATTACHMENT

MANDATE REVERSING

03/10/2016: MANDATE REVERSING

APPEAL AUTHENTICATED CERTIFICATE

04/17/2014: ORIGINAL RECORD ON APPEAL PREPARED

NOTICE OF APPEAL

02/26/2014: NOTICE OF APPEAL

DEF RESP'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

02/19/2014: DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

FORECLOSURE CASE STATUS FORM

12/17/2013: FORECLOSURE CASE STATUS FORM

DEF RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

10/11/2013: DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF HEARING

09/23/2013: NOTICE OF HEARING

DEFT RESP'S PROPOSED

09/23/2013: DEFT- RESP'S PROPOSED

DEF RESP'S MOTION

09/23/2013: DEF-RESP'S MOTION

NOTICE OF HEARING

09/20/2013: NOTICE OF HEARING

DEF RESP'S AMENDED MOTION

09/12/2013: DEF-RESP'S AMENDED MOTION

AFFIDAVIT

08/02/2013: AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT

07/17/2013: AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT

DEF RESP'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

07/15/2013: DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF FILING

07/15/2013: NOTICE OF FILING

NOTICE OF FILING

07/15/2013: NOTICE OF FILING

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2016
  • RETURNED ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • AGREED ORDER; ON JOINT MOTION TO RETURN ORIGINAL DOCS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • MOTION; FOR RETURN OF ORIGINAL NOTE AND ORIGINAL MORTGAGE; Filed by: INDYMAC FEDERAL BANK FSB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS; Vol./Book 19300, Page 1452, 3 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • PLTF-PET'S MOTION; FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO-COUNSEL; /DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • APPEAL CLERK'S WORKSHEET WITH ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • MANDATE REVERSING; AND REMANDING; Vol./Book 19113, Page 2570, 3 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL; AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
139 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2016
  • APPELLANT; INDYMAC FEDERAL BANK FSB; Total Financial Assessment; 972.00; Total Payments and Credits; 972.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # SW-2016-00135; SEWARD INVESTIGATIONS; (8.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • APPELLANT; INDYMAC FEDERAL BANK FSB; Total Financial Assessment; 972.00; Total Payments and Credits; 972.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • APPELLANT; INDYMAC FEDERAL BANK FSB; Total Financial Assessment; 972.00; Total Payments and Credits; 972.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # SB-2016-02068; DON SEWARD; (177.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • APPELLANT; INDYMAC FEDERAL BANK FSB; Total Financial Assessment; 972.00; Total Payments and Credits; 972.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 177.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • APPELLANT; INDYMAC FEDERAL BANK FSB; Total Financial Assessment; 972.00; Total Payments and Credits; 972.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # SB-2014-06931; INDYMAC FEDERAL BANK FSB; (313.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • APPELLANT; INDYMAC FEDERAL BANK FSB; Total Financial Assessment; 972.00; Total Payments and Credits; 972.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 313.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • APPELLANT; INDYMAC FEDERAL BANK FSB; Total Financial Assessment; 972.00; Total Payments and Credits; 972.00; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2014-33049; BLANK ROME LLP; (210.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2014
  • APPELLANT; INDYMAC FEDERAL BANK FSB; Total Financial Assessment; 972.00; Total Payments and Credits; 972.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 210.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • APPELLANT; INDYMAC FEDERAL BANK FSB; Total Financial Assessment; 972.00; Total Payments and Credits; 972.00; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2014-16204; BLANK ROME LLP; (106.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • APPELLANT; INDYMAC FEDERAL BANK FSB; Total Financial Assessment; 972.00; Total Payments and Credits; 972.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 106.00

    Read MoreRead Less