This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/18/2018 at 20:41:07 (UTC).

HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, et al vs. SCOTT THOMAS, et al

Case Summary

On 04/02/2009 HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SCOTT THOMAS. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ST. JOHN, SUSAN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5-CI

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ST. JOHN, SUSAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FIELDSTONE MORTGAGE INVESTMENT TRUST

HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES

SALAZAR, MARIO

Clearwater, FL 33760

TENANT 2

TENANT 3

TENANT 4

TENANT 5

TENANT 6

TENANT 7

TENANT 8

THOMAS, MITZI ALSO KNOWN AS THOMAS, MITZI MICHELLE

Tampa, FL 33629

THOMAS, SCOTT ALSO KNOWN AS THOMAS, SCOTT DAVID

Tampa, FL 33629

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JASON C MCDONALD

Attorney at SHD LEGAL GROUP PA

1501 Nw 49 St Suite 200

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

MARK A OLIVERA

Attorney at UDREN LAW OFFICES PC

2101 W Commercial Blvd Ste 5000

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

Defendant Attorneys

CRAIG E ROTHBURD

320 W Kennedy Blvd Suite 700

Tampa, FL 33606

CRAIG E ROTHBURD, ESQ

Attorney at CRAIG E ROTHBURD P A

320 W Kennedy Blvd Ste 700

Tampa, FL 33606

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

09/17/2014: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

04/02/2014: ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

04/02/2014: CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

03/24/2014: STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

EXHIBIT

03/24/2014: EXHIBIT

PLTF PET'S MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

03/24/2014: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/24/2014: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

RESPONSE

01/30/2014: RESPONSE

EXHIBIT

11/25/2013: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

11/25/2013: EXHIBIT

DEF RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS

11/25/2013: DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS

AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES

08/20/2013: AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES

AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES

08/20/2013: AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES

AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

08/20/2013: AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

NOTICE

08/20/2013: NOTICE

ORDER GRANTING

05/30/2013: ORDER GRANTING

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL

05/20/2013: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL

(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

09/17/2014: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2014
  • NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS; Vol./Book 19354, Page 2473, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2014
  • FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2014
  • CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; PROPOSED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2014
  • ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; /DIRECTING CLERK TO CHANGE COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2014
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; /EMAIL DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2014
  • CASE REOPENED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2014
  • PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2014
  • EXHIBIT; A- CLIENT CONSENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2014
  • STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • RESPONSE; TO MOTION TO DISMSS OR ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
142 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2009
  • SUMMONS TO PROCESS SERVER; Comment: SUMMONS TO PROCESS SERVER- AMICUS (7); VER: N; K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2009
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Comment: CIVIL COVER SHEET; VER: F; P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2009
  • NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Comment: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS OR16545PG1867-001; VER: F; P; Vol./Book 16545, Page 1867, 001 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2009
  • COMPLAINT; Comment: COMPLAINT; VER: F; P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2009
  • THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION; Comment: THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION 007 BY 0025 - RANDOM MF; VER: N; P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2009
  • CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2009
  • CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF; FIELDSTONE MORTGAGE INVESTMENT TRUST; Total Financial Assessment; 21.50; Total Payments and Credits; 21.50; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2016-32558; SUNBELT TITLE AGENCY; (21.50)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF; FIELDSTONE MORTGAGE INVESTMENT TRUST; Total Financial Assessment; 21.50; Total Payments and Credits; 21.50; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF; FIELDSTONE MORTGAGE INVESTMENT TRUST; Total Financial Assessment; 21.50; Total Payments and Credits; 21.50; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 18.50

    Read MoreRead Less