Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/19/2018 at 22:44:38 (UTC).

HOUSEHOLD FINANCE CORPORATION III vs. KATHLEEN SIMON

Case Summary

On 08/24/2009 HOUSEHOLD FINANCE CORPORATION III filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KATHLEEN SIMON. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHAEFER, JOHN A. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4-CI

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHAEFER, JOHN A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOUSEHOLD FINANCE CORPORATION III

Defendant

SIMON, KATHLEEN

Clearwater, FL 33761

Garnishees

SUNTRUST BANK

C/O Corporation Service Company Ra 1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

BANK OF AMERICA NA

101 East Kennedy Blvd

Tampa, FL 33602

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA

Attn: Legal Department 144 Southwest Shore Blvd

Tampa, FL 33609

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

C/O Legal Department 1 Independent Dr

Jacksonville, FL 32202

CONTINENTAL AIRLINES INC

1200 S Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

AMANDA C ROLFE

Attorney at ROLFE & LOBELLO P A

Po Box 4400

Jacksonville, FL 32201

LAWRENCE C ROLFE

Attorney at ROLFE AND LOBELLO P A

Po Box 4400

Jacksonville, FL 33201-4400

THOMAS LOBELLO, III

Attorney at ROLFE & LOBELLO PA

Post Office Box 4400

Jacksonville, FL 32201-4400

Garnishee Attorneys

JOHN A BARRY

Attorney at SUNTRUST BANK

7455 Chancellor Dr

Orlando, FL 32809

ANA JHONES

Attorney at HALEY AND JHONES P A

9100 S Dadeland Blvd Ste 1500 Pmb 150048

Miami, FL 33156

J T HALEY

Attorney at HALEY AND JHONES PA

9100 S Dadeland Blvd Ste 1500

Miami, FL 33156

JOSEPH D WARGO

Attorney at WARGO AND FRENCH

201 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 1000

Miami, FL 33131

JOHN B KENT

Attorney at MARKS GRAY P A

Post Office Box 447

Jacksonville, FL 32201

 

Court Documents

(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

05/26/2017: (NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

03/15/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

CERTIFICATE

03/13/2017: CERTIFICATE

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

02/27/2017: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

MOTION

02/27/2017: MOTION

NOTICE

05/12/2016: NOTICE

PLTF PET'S MOTION

04/08/2016: PLTF-PET'S MOTION

CERTIFICATE

03/18/2016: CERTIFICATE

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

02/25/2016: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

NOTICE

10/21/2015: NOTICE

PLTF PET'S MOTION

09/24/2015: PLTF-PET'S MOTION

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION REQUEST FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

08/13/2015: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION-REQUEST FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

08/13/2015: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

10/02/2014: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

ANSWER OF GARNISHEE

09/10/2014: ANSWER OF GARNISHEE

CERTIFICATE

09/10/2014: CERTIFICATE

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

08/26/2014: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

NOTICE

06/01/2017: NOTICE

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2017
  • NOTICE; OF PLTF REMITTING FUNDS TO GARNISHEES ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • (NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; AND DISSOLUTION OF GARNISHMENT - WELLS FARGO BANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • ANSWER OF GARNISHEE; WELLS FARGO BANK NA AND DEMAND FOR GARNISHMENT FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT RETD SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • CERTIFICATE; OF SERVICE OF A COPY OF THE MOTION FOR GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • MOTION; WELLS FARGO BANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • NOTICE OF FORFEITURE OF UNCLAIMED MONEY UNDER F.S.116.21; 2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • NOTICE; REMITTING FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • ORDER; DISSOLVING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND TAXING COSTS; Vol./Book 19155, Page 963, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
95 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2017
  • PLAINTIFF; HOUSEHOLD FINANCE CORPORATION III; Total Financial Assessment; 425.00; Total Payments and Credits; 425.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • PLAINTIFF; HOUSEHOLD FINANCE CORPORATION III; Total Financial Assessment; 425.00; Total Payments and Credits; 425.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2016-07244; HOUSEHOLD FINANCE CORPORATION III; (85.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • PLAINTIFF; HOUSEHOLD FINANCE CORPORATION III; Total Financial Assessment; 425.00; Total Payments and Credits; 425.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • PLAINTIFF; HOUSEHOLD FINANCE CORPORATION III; Total Financial Assessment; 425.00; Total Payments and Credits; 425.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-29223; HOUSEHOLD FINANCE CORPORATION III; (85.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • PLAINTIFF; HOUSEHOLD FINANCE CORPORATION III; Total Financial Assessment; 425.00; Total Payments and Credits; 425.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; HOUSEHOLD FINANCE CORPORATION III; Total Financial Assessment; 425.00; Total Payments and Credits; 425.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2014-48914; HOUSEHOLD FINANCE CORPORATION III; (85.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; HOUSEHOLD FINANCE CORPORATION III; Total Financial Assessment; 425.00; Total Payments and Credits; 425.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2012
  • PLAINTIFF; HOUSEHOLD FINANCE CORPORATION III; Total Financial Assessment; 425.00; Total Payments and Credits; 425.00; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # CVCLW-2012-21515; ROLFE AND LOBELLO PA; (85.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2012
  • PLAINTIFF; HOUSEHOLD FINANCE CORPORATION III; Total Financial Assessment; 425.00; Total Payments and Credits; 425.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • DEFENDANT; SIMON, KATHLEEN; Total Financial Assessment; 100.00; Total Payments and Credits; 100.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 100.00

    Read MoreRead Less