This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/18/2018 at 18:06:28 (UTC).

GORILLA CAPITAL LOAN SOLUTIONS INC Vs. YVONNE VARGAS KANE, et al

Case Summary

On 03/18/2009 GORILLA CAPITAL LOAN SOLUTIONS INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against YVONNE VARGAS KANE. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8-CI

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WELLS FARGO BANK NA AS TRUSTEE FOR STANWICH MTG LOAN TRUST SERIES 2010-3

GORILLA CAPITAL LOAN SOLUTIONS INC

GORILLA CAPITAL LOAN SOLUTIONS LLC

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

Gulfport, FL 33707

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Gulfport, FL 33707

CACH LLC

CITY OF ST PETERSBURG BEACH

St Petersburg, FL 33706

FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE CO

KANE, WILLIAM J FORMERLY KNOWN AS UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF YVONNE VARGAS KANE

Gulfport, FL 33707

KANE, YVONNE VARGAS

Gulfport, FL 33707

KIPPS COLONY ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSN INC

5901 Sun Blvdsuite 200

St Petersburg, FL 33715

PASADENA YACHT AND COUNTRY CLUB MASTER ASSN INC

5901 Sun Blvd Suite 200

St Petersburg, FL 33715

SOUTHERN INVESTMENTS LLC

C/O Gary Wagner R/A 3300 Highlands Bridge

Sarasota, FL 34235

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JAMES J SPANOLIOS

Attorney at SHAPIRO FISHMAN GACHE LLP

4630 Woodland Corp Blvd Ste 100

Tampa, FL 33614

KELLY E MCGUIRE

Attorney at ROBERTSON ANSCHUTZ SCHNEID P L

6409 Congress Ave Ste 100

Boca Raton, FL 33487

RAHIM J WEST, ESQ

Attorney at GARCIA PAEZ PA

5979 Nw 151St Street Ste 111

Miami Lakes, FL 33014

MEGHAN A KENEFIC

Attorney at SHAPIRO FISHMAN GACHE LLP

4630 Woodland Corp Blvd Ste 100

Tampa, FL 33614

Defendant Attorneys

MARTIN S FRIEDMAN

2548 Blairstone Pines

Tallahassee, FL 32301

BENJAMIN HILLARD

13143 66 St N

Largo, FL 33773

BENJAMIN HILLARD, ESQ

KAREN E MALLER

1 Progress Plaza Suite 1210

St Petersburg, FL 33701

KAREN E MALLER, ESQ

Attorney at POWELL CARNEY MALLER PA

200 Central Ave Ste 1210

St Petersburg, FL 33701

PAUL T HINCKLEY

Attorney at BECKER AND POLIAKOFF PA

111 N Orange Ave Ste 1400

Orlando, FL 32801

SCOTT P KIERNAN

Attorney at BECKER & POLIAKOFF PA

100 Whetstone Pl Ste 302

St Augustine, FL 32086

 

Court Documents

APPEAL DOCUMENT

06/25/2015: APPEAL DOCUMENT

ORDER GRANTING

08/21/2018: ORDER GRANTING

DCA ORDER INITIAL BRIEF DUE

10/30/2015: DCA ORDER INITIAL BRIEF DUE

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

10/27/2015: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

ORDER DENYING

06/12/2015: ORDER DENYING

NOTICE OF HEARING

05/01/2015: NOTICE OF HEARING

STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

08/13/2014: STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

ANSWER AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

12/20/2013: ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

SUMMONS EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

12/19/2013: SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE

EXHIBIT

11/26/2013: EXHIBIT

NOTICE OF FILING

11/26/2013: NOTICE OF FILING

EXHIBIT

07/02/2012: EXHIBIT

ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

03/09/2012: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

ORDER GRANTING

11/02/2010: ORDER GRANTING

AFFIDAVIT

07/01/2010: AFFIDAVIT

NOTICE OF FILING

06/08/2010: NOTICE OF FILING

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

03/01/2010: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

03/30/2009: SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

252 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2018
  • COPY CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RETURNED BY POST OFFICE; Doc # 11; (AMENDED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • COPY CORRESPONDENCE RE; Doc # 10; NOT REGISTERED AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • CERTIFICATE OF TITLE; Doc # 9; AMENDED; Vol./Book 20181, Page 1799, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Doc # 5; OF ORDER ON PLTFS MOTION TO CORRECT SCRIVENERS ERROR/COPY ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • ORDER GRANTING; Doc # 6; MOTN TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • ORDER GRANTING; Doc # 8; MTN TO CORRECT SCRIVENERS ERROR IN ORDER SUSSTITUTING PARTY PLTF/FINAL JUDGMENT/CERTIFICATE OF TITLE NUNC PRO TUNC/DIRECTIONS TO CLOSE CASE; Vol./Book 20180, Page 2313, 3 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Doc # 4; 052018 9:30 BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Doc # 3; 082018 9:30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • CASE REOPENED

    Read MoreRead Less
301 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2018
  • CLOSED PLAINTIFF - SUBSTITUTED; GORILLA CAPITAL LOAN SOLUTIONS INC; Total Financial Assessment; 5,782.00; Total Payments and Credits; 5,782.00; Balance Due 0.00; Draw Down Account; Receipt # CV-2018-13652; GORILLA CAPITAL LOAN SOLUTIONS INC; (50.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • CLOSED PLAINTIFF - SUBSTITUTED; GORILLA CAPITAL LOAN SOLUTIONS INC; Total Financial Assessment; 5,782.00; Total Payments and Credits; 5,782.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • CLOSED PLAINTIFF - SUBSTITUTED; GORILLA CAPITAL LOAN SOLUTIONS INC; Total Financial Assessment; 5,782.00; Total Payments and Credits; 5,782.00; Balance Due 0.00; REALAUCTION PAYMENT; Receipt # CV-2015-43551; GORILLA CAPITAL LOAN SOLUTIONS INC; (5,600.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • CLOSED PLAINTIFF - SUBSTITUTED; GORILLA CAPITAL LOAN SOLUTIONS INC; Total Financial Assessment; 5,782.00; Total Payments and Credits; 5,782.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 5,600.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • CLOSED PLAINTIFF - SUBSTITUTED; GORILLA CAPITAL LOAN SOLUTIONS INC; Total Financial Assessment; 5,782.00; Total Payments and Credits; 5,782.00; Balance Due 0.00; REALAUCTION PAYMENT; Receipt # RA-2015-09401; DAVID SCHNEID; (49.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • CLOSED PLAINTIFF - SUBSTITUTED; GORILLA CAPITAL LOAN SOLUTIONS INC; Total Financial Assessment; 5,782.00; Total Payments and Credits; 5,782.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 49.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • CLOSED PLAINTIFF - SUBSTITUTED; GORILLA CAPITAL LOAN SOLUTIONS INC; Total Financial Assessment; 5,782.00; Total Payments and Credits; 5,782.00; Balance Due 0.00; REALAUCTION PAYMENT; Receipt # RA-2015-09388; DAVID SCHNEID; (70.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • CLOSED PLAINTIFF - SUBSTITUTED; GORILLA CAPITAL LOAN SOLUTIONS INC; Total Financial Assessment; 5,782.00; Total Payments and Credits; 5,782.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 70.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • CLOSED PLAINTIFF - SUBSTITUTED; GORILLA CAPITAL LOAN SOLUTIONS INC; Total Financial Assessment; 5,782.00; Total Payments and Credits; 5,782.00; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-27216; CASTLE LAW GROUP PA; (13.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • CLOSED PLAINTIFF - SUBSTITUTED; GORILLA CAPITAL LOAN SOLUTIONS INC; Total Financial Assessment; 5,782.00; Total Payments and Credits; 5,782.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 13.00

    Read MoreRead Less