This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/18/2018 at 18:53:42 (UTC).

GMAC MORTGAGE LLC vs. PETER BENNETT, et al

Case Summary

On 03/23/2009 GMAC MORTGAGE LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against PETER BENNETT. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHAEFER, JOHN A. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9-CI

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHAEFER, JOHN A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GMAC MORTGAGE LLC

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE FOR HARBORVIEW MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST ETC

Defendants

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES

TENANT 6

Indian Rocks Beach, FL 33785

TENANT 7

TENANT 8

BENNETT, ANDREA ALSO KNOWN AS UNKNOWN, SPOUSE OF PETER J BENNETT

Tampa, FL 33609

BENNETT, PETER ALSO KNOWN AS BENNETT, PETER J

Tampa, FL 33609

EDDY, BECKY

Indian Rocks Beach, FL 33785

FOSSBENDER, BROTHER

Indian Rocks Beach, FL 33785

FOSSBENDER, NICHOLE

Indian Rocks Beach, FL 33785

GOLDSWORTH, JUDITH

Tampa, FL 33609

GOLDSWORTH, SAMUEL J

Tampa, FL 33609

LANE, ANTHONY

Indian Rocks Beach, FL 33785

STAUBITZ, GARY

Indian Rocks Beach, FL 33785

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WALLACE G WILKERSON, II

Attorney at MORRIS SCHNEIDER WITTSTADT

5110 Eisenhower Blvd Ste 302A

Tampa, FL 33634

CHRISTOPHER Y MILLS

Attorney at PENDERGAST AND MORGAN P A

6675 Corporate Center Suite 301

Jacksonville, FL 32216

LAURENCE S BARSKY

Attorney at ROBERTSON ANSCHUTZ SCHNEID

6409 Congress Ave Ste 100

Boca Raton, FL 33487

MICHELLE ZELINA

Attorney at CHOICE LEGAL GROUP

1800 Nw 49Th St Ste 120

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

JAMIE EPSTEIN, ESQ

Attorney at ROBERTSON ANSCHUTZ AND SCHNEID P L

6409 Congress Ave Ste 100

Boca Raton, FL 33487

TIMOTHY SCOLARO, ESQ

Attorney at ROBERTSON ANSCHUTZ SCHNEID

6409 Congress Ave Ste 100

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant Attorneys

ROBERT A LEVINE

5809 S 2Nd St

Tampa, FL 33611

JON B COATS, JR

1519 Dr Mlk Jr St N

St Petersburg, FL 33704

JON B COATS JR, ESQ

Attorney at COATS SCHMIDT P A

4055 Central Avenue

St Petersburg, FL 33713

Other Attorneys

JAMIE EPSTEIN

6409 Congress Ave Suite 100

Boca Raton, FL 33487

 

Court Documents

ORDER

01/30/2017: ORDER

EXHIBIT

01/27/2017: EXHIBIT

PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE

10/28/2016: PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE

NOTICE OF FILING

09/19/2016: NOTICE OF FILING

NOTICE OF FILING

04/26/2016: NOTICE OF FILING

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/12/2016: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/12/2016: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/11/2016: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF

02/05/2016: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF

NOTICE CAUSE IS AT ISSUE READY FOR TRIAL

01/25/2016: NOTICE CAUSE IS AT ISSUE READY FOR TRIAL

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF

12/07/2015: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF

ORDER GRANTING

12/04/2015: ORDER GRANTING

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

07/31/2015: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

PLTF PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT

07/31/2015: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT

RETURNED FROM POST OFFICE

05/18/2015: RETURNED FROM POST OFFICE

ORDER APPROVING REPORT RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL M

12/12/2014: ORDER APPROVING REPORT RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE

RETURNED FROM POST OFFICE

08/06/2014: RETURNED FROM POST OFFICE

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

12/03/2013: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

85 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2017
  • CERTIFICATE; OF SERVICE OF ATTACHED COPY ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CANCELED; JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE; (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL); ORDER FROM COURT; CANCELLED PER COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • RETURNED ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • ATTORNEY COVER LETTER; RCVD BY COURT 13017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • ORDER; TO VACATE FINAL JDMT/CANCEL SALE 013117/DISMISS ACTION/DISSOLVE LIS PENDENS/RTN ORIGINAL DOCS; Vol./Book 19501, Page 2329, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • CASE REOPENED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE; /VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE/DISMISS ACTION W/O PREJUDICE/DISSOLVE LIS PENDENS AND RELEASE ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • EXHIBIT; A - COPY OF CONSENT UNIFORM FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • EXHIBIT; B - AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF PLTFS MOTN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • CERTIFICATE; OF SERVICE OF ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
170 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2009
  • NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Comment: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; VER: F; P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2009
  • COMPLAINT; Comment: COMPLAINT; VER: F; P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2009
  • THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION; Comment: THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION 007 BY 6845 - RANDOM MF; VER: N; P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2009
  • CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • PLAINTIFF; DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY; Total Financial Assessment; 50.00; Total Payments and Credits; 50.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2017-02984; DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY; (50.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • PLAINTIFF; DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY; Total Financial Assessment; 50.00; Total Payments and Credits; 50.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2016
  • CLOSED PLAINTIFF - SUBSTITUTED; GMAC MORTGAGE LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 43.00; Total Payments and Credits; 43.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # SW-2016-00120; A BETTER PROCESS; (40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2016
  • CLOSED PLAINTIFF - SUBSTITUTED; GMAC MORTGAGE LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 43.00; Total Payments and Credits; 43.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • CLOSED PLAINTIFF - SUBSTITUTED; GMAC MORTGAGE LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 43.00; Total Payments and Credits; 43.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # SW-2015-00832; A BETTER PROCESS; (3.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • CLOSED PLAINTIFF - SUBSTITUTED; GMAC MORTGAGE LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 43.00; Total Payments and Credits; 43.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 3.00

    Read MoreRead Less