This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/18/2018 at 11:13:05 (UTC).

FIFTH THIRD MORTGAGE COMPANY vs. MARC J BURLING, et al

Case Summary

On 02/11/2009 FIFTH THIRD MORTGAGE COMPANY filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MARC J BURLING. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ST. JOHN, SUSAN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1-CI

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ST. JOHN, SUSAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIFTH THIRD MORTGAGE COMPANY

Defendants

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARC J BURLING

Largo, FL 33774

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF STEPHANIE BECK

Largo, FL 33774

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

Largo, FL 33774

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Largo, FL 33774

ANY UNKNOWN SPOUSE

BECK, STEPHANIE

Largo, FL 33774

BURLING, MARC J

Largo, FL 33774

GRANTEES ASSIGNEES CREDITORS LIENORS

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Tampa, FL 33602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

THOMAS M WOOD

Attorney at SHUMAKER LOOP KENDRICK LLP

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 2800

Tampa, FL 33602

LAURA L WALKER

Attorney at GILBERT GARCIA GROUP PA

2005 Pan Am Circle Suite 110

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorneys

BENJAMIN HILLARD

13143 66 St N

Largo, FL 33773

BENJAMIN HILLARD, ESQ

Attorney at CASTLE LAW GROUP

13143 66Th St N

Largo, FL 33773

JOHN F RUDY, III

Attorney at ASSISTANT US ATTY

400 N Tampa St Ste 3200

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

MOTION

10/06/2014: MOTION

NOTICE OF SALE

05/12/2014: NOTICE OF SALE

EXHIBIT

05/05/2014: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

04/15/2014: EXHIBIT

STIPULATION

04/15/2014: STIPULATION

SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AS TO

12/04/2013: SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AS TO

SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AS TO

11/27/2013: SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AS TO

CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE W FORECLOSURE PROCEDURES

11/21/2013: CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH FORECLOSURE PROCEDURES

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

10/17/2013: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

09/27/2013: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF HEARING

09/10/2013: NOTICE OF HEARING

PLTF PET'S MOTION

09/09/2013: PLTF-PET'S MOTION

EXHIBIT

07/03/2013: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

07/03/2013: EXHIBIT

PLTF PET'S MOTION FOR CONTEMPT

07/03/2013: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR CONTEMPT

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

06/19/2013: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

05/14/2013: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

WRIT OF POSSESSION

12/03/2014: WRIT OF POSSESSION

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2014
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION; RETURNED EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION; ISSUED TO ATTY 12/3/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; PROPOSED ORDER RCVD BY COURT 102314

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE; RTD CHECK WRIT MUST BE EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • CASE REOPENED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • MOTION; FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • NOTICE; OF EVICTION AND TENANT RIGHTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2014
  • CERTIFICATE OF TITLE; Vol./Book 18501, Page 683, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2014
  • CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
179 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2009
  • CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2009
  • CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; FIFTH THIRD MORTGAGE COMPANY; Total Financial Assessment; 2,514.70; Total Payments and Credits; 2,514.70; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2014-54832; FIFTH THIRD MORTGAGE COMPANY; (50.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; FIFTH THIRD MORTGAGE COMPANY; Total Financial Assessment; 2,514.70; Total Payments and Credits; 2,514.70; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; FIFTH THIRD MORTGAGE COMPANY; Total Financial Assessment; 2,514.70; Total Payments and Credits; 2,514.70; Balance Due 0.00; REALAUCTION PAYMENT; Receipt # CV-2014-46179; BIDDER 10299; (2,345.70)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; FIFTH THIRD MORTGAGE COMPANY; Total Financial Assessment; 2,514.70; Total Payments and Credits; 2,514.70; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 2,345.70

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; FIFTH THIRD MORTGAGE COMPANY; Total Financial Assessment; 2,514.70; Total Payments and Credits; 2,514.70; Balance Due 0.00; REALAUCTION PAYMENT; Receipt # RA-2014-07318; Robert Gaudsmith; (49.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; FIFTH THIRD MORTGAGE COMPANY; Total Financial Assessment; 2,514.70; Total Payments and Credits; 2,514.70; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 49.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; FIFTH THIRD MORTGAGE COMPANY; Total Financial Assessment; 2,514.70; Total Payments and Credits; 2,514.70; Balance Due 0.00; REALAUCTION PAYMENT; Receipt # RA-2014-06454; Robert Gaudsmith; (70.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; FIFTH THIRD MORTGAGE COMPANY; Total Financial Assessment; 2,514.70; Total Payments and Credits; 2,514.70; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 70.00

    Read MoreRead Less