This case was last updated from Pinellas County Courts on 12/17/2018 at 14:33:51 (UTC).

ESTATE OF FLORA MAE FALANA vs. HEARTHSTONE SENIOR COMMUNITIES INC, et al

Case Summary

On 12/14/2010 ESTATE OF FLORA MAE FALANA filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against HEARTHSTONE SENIOR COMMUNITIES INC,. This case was filed in Pinellas County Courts, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHAMES, MARK I. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2-CI

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2010

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHAMES, MARK I

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESTATE OF FLORA MAE FALANA

Defendants

BLAKE, BRUCE M

Jacksonville, FL 32216

BOCA CIEGA REHABILITATION LLC

360 Central Ave Ste 1550

St Petersburg, FL 33701

DAVIS, DANIEL R

Sarasota, FL 34233

HEARTHSTONE SENIOR COMMUNITIES INC

360 Central Ave Nste 1550

St Petersburg, FL 33701

HOWE, DEBRA

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

SENIOR HEALTH MANAGEMENT LLC

4730 Acorn Circle

Sarasota, FL 34233

SENIOR HEALTH MANAGEMENT-GULF COAST LLC

4730 Acorn Circle

Sarasota, FL 34233

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARL R WILANDER

Attorney at WILKES AND MCHUGH PA

Tampa Commons One N Dale Mabry Hwy Suite 800

Tampa, FL 33609

Defendant Attorneys

AMY L CHRISTIANSEN

360 Central Ave #1550

St. Petersburg, FL 33701

JAMES MORIARTY

Attorney at SPECTOR GADON AND ROSEN LLP

360 Central Ave Ste 1550

St Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE

06/19/2013: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT SERVICE OF PROCESS

06/19/2013: AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

08/28/2013: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF HEARING

04/29/2013: NOTICE OF HEARING

PLTF PET'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW

07/11/2013: PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

06/11/2013: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

AFFIDAVIT SERVICE OF PROCESS

06/19/2013: AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS

AMENDED

04/23/2013: AMENDED

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO

05/30/2013: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2013
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED BY COURT 091813

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL; W/PREJUDICE; Vol./Book 18168, Page 2487, 2 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2013
  • DocketSTIPULATION; FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/PREJ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2013
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; OF HEARING 082913

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2013
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; FOR COURT TO PLAINTIFF IN RE: WITH ISSUE OF SETTLEMENT OF CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2013
  • DocketATTORNEY COVER LETTER; RCVD BY COURT 061213

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2013
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS; 060713 SENIOR HEALTH MANAGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
354 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2010
  • DocketCircuit Civil Filing - Fee Paid $; Comment: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE PAID $400.00; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2010
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTORNEY; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTORNEY; VER: N; K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2010
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Comment: CIVIL COVER SHEET; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Comment: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2010
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Comment: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2010
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Comment: COMPLAINT; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2010
  • DocketTHIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION; Comment: THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION 008 BY 0932 - RANDOM CI; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2010
  • DocketCASE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2013
  • DocketPLAINTIFF; ESTATE OF FLORA MAE FALANA; Total Financial Assessment; 70.00; Total Payments and Credits; 70.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # SPB-2013-09274; WILKES AND MCHUGH P A; (70.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2013
  • DocketPLAINTIFF; ESTATE OF FLORA MAE FALANA; Total Financial Assessment; 70.00; Total Payments and Credits; 70.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 470.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOCA CIEGA REHABILITATION LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SENIOR HEALTH MANAGEMENT-GULF COAST LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SENIOR HEALTH MANAGEMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HEARTHSTONE SENIOR COMMUNITIES INC DOING BUSINESS AS BOCA CIEGA CENTER DOING BUSINESS AS BOCA CI is a litigant