Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/19/2018 at 19:00:11 (UTC).

DITECH FINANCIAL LLC Vs. SAMY BESHIE, et al

Case Summary

On 07/30/2009 DITECH FINANCIAL LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SAMY BESHIE. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAY, JACK. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7-CI

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAY, JACK

 

Party Details

Defendants and Plaintiffs

BANK OF AMERICA NA

GREEN TREE SERVICING LLC

U S BANK TRUST N A AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST

DITECH FINANCIAL LLC FORMERLY KNOWN AS GREEN TREE SERVICING LLC

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SAMY BESHIE

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION

BESHIE, SAMY ALSO KNOWN AS BESHIE, SAMY L

St Petersburg, FL 33716

CAROLINA FIRST BANK FORMERLY KNOWN AS MERCANTILE BANK

102 S Main St

Greenville, SC 29601

HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF WINDWARD ETC

C/O Rabin And Parker 28163 Us Highway 19 North

Clearwater, FL 33761

BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY ITS SUCCESSORS OR ASSIGNS

5830 142Nd Ave

Clearwater, FL 33760

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TARA CASTILLO

Attorney at ALDRIDGE PITE LLP

1615 S Congress Ave Ste 200

Delray Beach, FL 33445

AUGUST MANGENEY

Attorney at LDP LAW AND ASSOCIATES

11555 Heron Bay Blvd Ste 100-A

Coral Springs, FL 33076

SHANE FULLER

Attorney at CHOICE LEGAL GROUP PA

Post Office Box 9908

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33310-0908

Defendant Attorneys

JOSHUA KNIGHT

Attorney at ALBERTELLI LAW

5404 Cypress Ctr Dr Ste 300

Tampa, FL 33609

ALISON VERGES WALTERS, ESQ

Attorney at KELLEY KRONENBERG

1511 N Westshore Blvd Ste 400

Tampa, FL 33607

EMILY J HANSEN-BROWN

Attorney at TAYLOR AND CARLS PA

111 N Orange Ave Suite 1400

Orlando, FL 32801

UTA S GROVE

Attorney at GROVE AND CINTON

2600 E Bay Dr Ste 220

Largo, FL 33771

MARK R WATSON, JR

Attorney at RABIN PARKER P A

28059 Us Hwy 19 N Ste 301

Clearwater, FL 33761

 

Court Documents

RETURNED FROM POST OFFICE

05/22/2017: RETURNED FROM POST OFFICE

NOTICE OF SALE

05/19/2017: NOTICE OF SALE

NOTICE OF FILING

05/03/2017: NOTICE OF FILING

ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

04/06/2017: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/29/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS AMEND COMPLAINT RETURNED SERVED

10/13/2016: SUMMONS-AMEND COMPLAINT RETURNED SERVED

REQUEST SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT

09/19/2016: REQUEST SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT

ORDER GRANTING

08/30/2016: ORDER GRANTING

MOTION TO AMEND

08/18/2016: MOTION TO AMEND

EXHIBIT

08/18/2016: EXHIBIT

AMENDED COMPLAINT

08/18/2016: AMENDED COMPLAINT

ATTACHMENT

06/19/2014: ATTACHMENT

PLTF PET'S MOTION SUBSTITUTING PARTY

06/19/2014: PLTF-PET'S MOTION SUBSTITUTING PARTY

ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

05/14/2013: ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

NON RECORDED JOINT STIPULATION

05/08/2013: NON RECORDED JOINT STIPULATION

ORDER GRANTING

03/25/2013: ORDER GRANTING

ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

03/25/2013: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

WRIT OF POSSESSION

01/09/2018: WRIT OF POSSESSION

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2018
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 5; - EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 4; ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • ATTORNEY COVER LETTER; Doc # 2; -- COURT RECEIVED 110117

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • CASE REOPENED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 1; WITH PROPOSED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF TITLE; Vol./Book 19703, Page 862, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE; (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL); REC VER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF SALE; U S BANK TRUST N A

    Read MoreRead Less
134 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2017
  • CLOSED PLAINTIFF - SUBSTITUTED; DITECH FINANCIAL LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 530.70; Total Payments and Credits; 530.70; Balance Due 0.00; REALAUCTION PAYMENT; Receipt # RA-2017-01730; Marshall Watson; (49.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • CLOSED PLAINTIFF - SUBSTITUTED; DITECH FINANCIAL LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 530.70; Total Payments and Credits; 530.70; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 49.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • CLOSED PLAINTIFF - SUBSTITUTED; DITECH FINANCIAL LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 530.70; Total Payments and Credits; 530.70; Balance Due 0.00; REALAUCTION PAYMENT; Receipt # RA-2017-01523; Marshall Watson; (70.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • CLOSED PLAINTIFF - SUBSTITUTED; DITECH FINANCIAL LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 530.70; Total Payments and Credits; 530.70; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 70.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • CLOSED PLAINTIFF - SUBSTITUTED; DITECH FINANCIAL LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 530.70; Total Payments and Credits; 530.70; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2016-32802; ditech financial llc; (20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • CLOSED PLAINTIFF - SUBSTITUTED; DITECH FINANCIAL LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 530.70; Total Payments and Credits; 530.70; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • CLOSED PLAINTIFF - SUBSTITUTED; DITECH FINANCIAL LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 530.70; Total Payments and Credits; 530.70; Balance Due 0.00; Draw Down Account; Receipt # SB-2016-09076; JOE DALY; (6.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • CLOSED PLAINTIFF - SUBSTITUTED; DITECH FINANCIAL LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 530.70; Total Payments and Credits; 530.70; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2013
  • CLOSED PLAINTIFF - SUBSTITUTED; BANK OF AMERICA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 3.00; Total Payments and Credits; 3.00; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # CVCLW-2013-48345; PROVEST; (3.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2013
  • CLOSED PLAINTIFF - SUBSTITUTED; BANK OF AMERICA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 3.00; Total Payments and Credits; 3.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 3.00

    Read MoreRead Less